Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1093 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 12/30/2021

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington, Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6958	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 30, 2021
BILL NUMBER: HB 1093	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Education matters.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Behning	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: Pending
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation:  Amends the membership and duties of the early learning advisory committee.
Makes changes to the definition of "school resource officer". Provides that, after June 30, 2023, if a school
corporation or charter school enters into a contract for a school resource officer, the school corporation or
charter school must enter into a memorandum of understanding with the law enforcement agency that
employs or appointed the individual who will perform the duties of a school resource officer. Provides that
certain parties are prohibited from incentivizing the enrollment, reenrollment, or continued attendance of a
student or prospective student by offering or giving an item that has monetary value. Requires the Indiana
charter school board (board) to appoint an executive director to carry out the duties and daily operations of
the board. Establishes the executive director's duties. Provides that the board shall establish certain processes.
Establishes the Indiana charter school board fund and provides that money in the fund is appropriated
continuously for purposes of the board. Provides that the department of education (department) may grant
an accomplished practitioner's license under certain conditions. Provides that the instructional days tuition
support distribution formula account for certain schools within a school corporation. Authorizes the
department to study and, if recommended, use machine scoring. Changes the department's review period for
certain funds. Repeals a provision concerning staffing of the board. Provides that the state board of education
shall assign to a school or school corporation (including adult high schools) a "null" or "no letter grade" for
the 2021-2022 school year.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2021 (retroactive); April 1, 2022; July 1, 2022.
Explanation of State Expenditures:  As of the above date, the fiscal analysis of this bill has not been
completed. Please contact the Office of Fiscal and Management Analysis for an update of this fiscal impact
statement.
HB 1093	1 Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jason Barrett,  317-232-9809. 
HB 1093	2