Introduced Version HOUSE BILL No. 1218 _____ DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL Citations Affected: IC 20-18-3-3; IC 20-51.4-2-4. Synopsis: Education matters. Provides that any statute or rule establishing requirements regarding teacher salary, evaluations, or curriculum or any other requirement regarding the employment of teachers other than teacher licensing requirements is, as applicable, repealed or voided. Requires the legislative services agency to prepare legislation for introduction in the 2023 regular session of the general assembly to make appropriate amendments to the Indiana Code necessary to conform with this provision. Amends the definition of "eligible student" for purposes of eligibility under the Indiana education scholarship account program. Effective: Upon passage; July 1, 2022; July 1, 2023. Lucas, Payne, Prescott January 6, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Education. 2022 IN 1218—LS 6325/DI 110 Introduced Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly. HOUSE BILL No. 1218 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning education. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 20-18-3-3 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 3 1, 2023]: Sec. 3. (a) Any statute or rule establishing requirements 4 regarding teacher salary, evaluations, or curriculum or any other 5 requirement regarding the employment of teachers other than 6 teacher licensing requirements is, as applicable, repealed or voided. 7 (b) This section does not affect contracts or agreements in effect 8 on June 30, 2023. However, this section applies to any contract or 9 agreement entered into or renewed after June 30, 2023. 10 SECTION 2. IC 20-51.4-2-4, AS ADDED BY P.L.165-2021, 11 SECTION 180, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS 12 [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 4. "Eligible student" refers to 13 an individual who: 14 (1) has legal settlement in Indiana; and 15 (2) is at least five (5) years of age and less than twenty-two (22) 16 years of age on the date in the school year specified in 17 IC 20-33-2-7. 2022 IN 1218—LS 6325/DI 110 2 1 (3) is a student with a disability at the time the account is 2 established who requires special education and for whom: 3 (A) an individualized education program; 4 (B) a service plan developed under 511 IAC 7-34; or 5 (C) a choice special education plan developed under 511 6 IAC 7-49; 7 has been developed; and 8 (4) meets the annual income qualification requirement for a 9 choice scholarship student under IC 20-51-1. 10 SECTION 3. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2022] (a) The legislative 11 services agency shall prepare legislation for introduction in the 12 2023 regular session of the general assembly to make appropriate 13 amendments to the Indiana Code necessary to conform with this 14 act. 15 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2024. 16 SECTION 4. An emergency is declared for this act. 2022 IN 1218—LS 6325/DI 110