*EH1254.2* February 18, 2022 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1254 _____ DIGEST OF HB 1254 (Updated February 17, 2022 12:46 pm - DI 140) Citations Affected: IC 16-41. Synopsis: Newborn screening requirements. Provides that beginning July 1, 2022, only a disorder recommended by a perinatal genetics and genomics advisory committee (committee) with expertise in newborn screening, and through protocols prescribed by the state department, may be added to the list of disorders requiring the examination of infants. Provides that beginning July 1, 2022, a committee with expertise in newborn screening, and through protocols established by the state department, may recommend the addition of a disorder to, or deletion of a disorder from, the required examination. Provides that the state department shall adopt rules to add disorders to, or delete disorders from, the required examination. Provides that the state department shall include any disorder added to or deleted from the required examination on a list on the state department's Internet web site. Provides that the committee shall affirm the addition of, or deletion of, any disorder to the examination requirement on an annual basis. Effective: July 1, 2022. Barrett, Rowray, Porter (SENATE SPONSORS — CHARBONNEAU, BROWN L, QADDOURA) January 6, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health. January 13, 2022, reported — Do Pass. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to Rule 127. January 20, 2022, amended, reported — Do Pass. January 24, 2022, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. January 25, 2022, read third time, passed. Yeas 90, nays 0. SENATE ACTION February 2, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services. February 10, 2022, reported favorably — Do Pass; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations. February 17, 2022, reported favorably — Do Pass. EH 1254—LS 7009/DI 104 February 18, 2022 Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1254 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning health. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 16-41-17-2, AS AMENDED BY P.L.19-2020, 2 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 3 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 2. (a) Subject to subsection (d), every infant shall 4 be given examinations at the earliest feasible time for the detection of 5 the following disorders: 6 (1) Phenylketonuria. 7 (2) Hypothyroidism. 8 (3) Hemoglobinopathies, including sickle cell anemia. 9 (4) Galactosemia. 10 (5) Maple Syrup urine disease. 11 (6) Homocystinuria. 12 (7) Inborn errors of metabolism that result in an intellectual 13 disability and that are designated by the state department. 14 (8) Congenital adrenal hyperplasia. 15 (9) Biotinidase deficiency. 16 (10) Disorders detected by tandem mass spectrometry or other 17 technologies with the same or greater detection capabilities as EH 1254—LS 7009/DI 104 2 1 tandem mass spectrometry, if the state department determines that 2 the technology is available for use by a designated laboratory 3 under section 7 of this chapter. 4 (11) Spinal muscular atrophy. 5 (12) Severe combined immunodeficiency. 6 (13) Beginning July 1, 2020, Krabbe disease. 7 (14) Beginning July 1, 2020, Pompe disease. 8 (15) Beginning July 1, 2020, Hurler syndrome (MPS1). 9 (16) Adrenoleukodystrophy (ALD). 10 (17) Beginning July 1, 2022, and in addition to the disorders 11 listed in subdivisions (1) through (16), only a disorder 12 recommended by a perinatal genetics and genomics advisory 13 committee with expertise in newborn screening and through 14 protocols prescribed by the state department. 15 Beginning July 1, 2022, a perinatal genetics and genomics advisory 16 committee with expertise in newborn screening, and through 17 protocols established by the state department, may recommend the 18 addition of a disorder to, or deletion of a disorder from, the 19 required examination under this subsection. The state department 20 shall adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 to add disorders to, or delete 21 disorders from, the required examination under this subsection. 22 The state department shall include any disorder added to or 23 deleted from the required examination on a list on the state 24 department's Internet web site. The perinatal genetics and 25 genomics advisory committee shall affirm the addition of, or 26 deletion of, any disorder to the examination requirement on an 27 annual basis. 28 (b) Subject to subsection (d), every infant shall be given a 29 physiologic hearing screening examination at the earliest feasible time 30 for the detection of hearing impairments. 31 (c) Subject to subsection (d), every infant shall be given a pulse 32 oximetry screening examination in accordance with rules adopted by 33 the state department for the detection of low oxygen levels. Section 34 10(a)(2) of this chapter does not apply to this subsection. 35 (d) If a parent of an infant objects in writing, for reasons pertaining 36 to religious beliefs only, the infant is exempt from the examinations 37 required by this chapter. EH 1254—LS 7009/DI 104 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Public Health, to which was referred House Bill 1254, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1254 as introduced.) BARRETT Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Ways and Means, to which was referred House Bill 1254, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: Page 2, line 15, before "The state" insert "Beginning July 1, 2022, a perinatal genetics and genomics advisory committee with expertise in newborn screening, and through protocols established by the state department, may recommend the addition of a disorder to, or deletion of a disorder from, the required examination under this subsection. The state department shall adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 to add disorders to, or delete disorders from, the required examination under this subsection.". Page 2, line 15, after "added to" insert "or deleted from". Page 2, line 16, delete "by subdivision (17)". Page 2, line 18, after "addition of" insert ", or deletion of,". Page 2, line 19, delete "under subdivision (17)". Page 2, delete lines 31 through 42. Delete page 3. and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1254 as printed January 13, 2022.) BROWN T Committee Vote: yeas 22, nays 0. EH 1254—LS 7009/DI 104 4 COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1254, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS and be reassigned to the Senate Committee on Appropriations. (Reference is to HB 1254 as printed January 20, 2022.) CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Appropriations, to which was referred Engrossed House Bill No. 1254, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. (Reference is to EHB 1254 as printed February 11, 2022.) MISHLER, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 EH 1254—LS 7009/DI 104