Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1354 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/02/2022

                    *EH1354.1*
February 22, 2022
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1354
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1354 (Updated February 21, 2022 11:08 am - DI 148)
Citations Affected:  Noncode.
Synopsis:  Requirements for SNAP participants. Urges the legislative
council to assign to an interim study committee the following topics:
(1) Requiring the custodial and noncustodial parents to cooperate with
the child support bureau as a condition of eligibility for assistance
under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP). (2)
Assigning individuals who are subject to federal work requirements for
SNAP eligibility to an employment and training program.
Effective:  Upon passage.
DeVon, Miller D
(SENATE SPONSORS — NIEMEYER, KOCH)
January 11, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Family, Children and
Human Affairs.
January 25, 2022, amended, reported — Do Pass.
January 27, 2022, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 31, 2022, read third time, passed. Yeas 63, nays 28.
SENATE ACTION
February 10, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children
Services.
February 21, 2022, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
EH 1354—LS 6805/DI 77  February 22, 2022
Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1354
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) The legislative
2 council is urged to assign to the appropriate interim study
3 committee the following topics:
4 (1) Requiring custodial and noncustodial parents to cooperate
5 with the child support bureau as a condition for SNAP
6 eligibility under 7 CFR 273.11.
7 (2) Assigning individuals who are subject to the work
8 requirements established under 7 U.S.C. 2015(d)(1) to an
9 employment and training program (as defined in 7 U.S.C.
10 2015(d)(4)(B)).
11 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2023.
12 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
EH 1354—LS 6805/DI 77 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Family, Children and Human
Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1354, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 1, line 4, delete "custodial".
Page 1, line 5, delete "parents and".
Page 1, line 8, delete "month" and insert "forty-five (45) day
period".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to HB 1354 as introduced.)
DEVON
Committee Vote: yeas 10, nays 2.
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Family and Children
Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1354, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as
follows:
Delete the title and insert the following:
A BILL FOR AN ACT concerning human services.
 Delete everything after the enacting clause and insert the following:
(SEE TEXT OF BILL)
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to HB 1354 as printed January 25, 2022.)
ROGERS, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1.
EH 1354—LS 6805/DI 77