Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0239 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2022

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6908	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 1, 2022
BILL NUMBER: SB 239	BILL AMENDED: Jan 31, 2022
SUBJECT: Practitioner Identification and Advertising.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Boehnlein	BILL STATUS: As Passed Senate
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Zent
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill provides that, beginning January 1, 2023, certain practitioners are subject
to disciplinary sanctions if the practitioner communicates or disseminates to the general public an
advertisement that includes deceptive or misleading information or does not prominently state the profession
or license held by the practitioner. The bill establishes certain exceptions. It provides, for purposes of the law
prohibiting the unlawful practice of medicine or osteopathic medicine, that "the practice of medicine or
osteopathic medicine" includes attaching to an individual's name additional terms or other specified words
that identify a member of a medical specialty. It also establishes certain exceptions.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2022.
Explanation of State Expenditures: A violation of the bill’s requirements would be subject to
administrative orders and procedures by the board or commission within the Professional Licensing Agency
(PLA) that governs the violating practitioner’s profession. The nature of the violation and the corrective
actions of the practitioner will determine the cost to PLA. Additionally, PLA would likely need to notify
license holders of the requirements established by the bill and post updates to the PLA website. These actions
are within the PLA’s routine administrative functions and should be able to be implemented with no
additional appropriations.  
Explanation of State Revenues:  If a violation occurs, the PLA may take an action that could impact state
revenue. If the violator has a license denied or revoked, fee revenue would decrease to the General Fund.
Health care practitioner license fees range between $40 and $200 biennially. The PLA may also impose a
fine of up to $1,000, which would be deposited in the General Fund.
SB 239	1 Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Professional Licensing Agency.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: IC 25-1-9-9; Legislative Services Agency, Indiana Handbook of Taxes, Revenues,
and Appropriations, FY 2021.
Fiscal Analyst: Adam White,  317-234-1360.
SB 239	2