Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0266 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2022

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 7075	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 1, 2022
BILL NUMBER: SB 266	BILL AMENDED: Jan 27, 2022
SUBJECT: Department of Child Services' Review of Base Rate. 
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Ford Jon	BILL STATUS: As Passed Senate
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Jeter
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
XFEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill establishes a process by which a child caring institution, group home,
secure private facility, or licensed child placing agency may request a review of base rates and other cost
based rates approved by the Department of Child Services (DCS). 
The bill also requires the DCS to give special consideration to approval of costs that are proven by a
residential treatment provider to have been previously approved by the DCS.  
It urges the Legislative Council to assign to the appropriate interim study committee, the topic of privatizing
the DCS.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2022.
Explanation of State Expenditures:  The RTSP’s payment rate is based on the eligible costs and the
utilization (or number of placements). Certain costs are disallowed in calculating the rate, including staffing
above the standard staffing ratio. If an RTSP proves that additional staff costs are related to child or staff
safety, these additional costs may be included in the rate. Other changes in the reimbursement rate are
indeterminate and would be based on whether the rules currently used to determine the rate would change
based on the definitions in the bill.
The DCS will have increased workload to review and amend its rules to conform with provisions of the bill
as needed. Also, the DCS’s workload will increase to provide notices to the RTSP, the legislator of the
RTSP, the chairpersons of the House Committee on Family, Children, and Human Affairs and the Senate
Committee on Family and Children Services, and post it on the DCS website.
SB 266	1 If the committee were to hold additional meetings to address this topic, there would be additional
expenditures for legislator per diem and travel reimbursement for the committee members. Any additional
expenditures must be within the committee’s budget, which is established by the Legislative Council.  
Additional Information - RTSP expenditures from state funds was about $222.7 M annually between FY
2017 and FY 2021. On average, state expenditures are 76% of the total spent for RTSP. Utilization decreased
43% between FY 2017 and FY 2021. Any expenditure outside of those allowed by Title IV-E programs
would be a state expense. 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues:  A RTSP of a local unit could receive additional reimbursement, but any
increase will be based on the differences between current rules and the requirements of the bill. 
State Agencies Affected: Department of Child Services.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources:  Sarah Faulkner; Aaron Atwell; DCS, Rate Setting Process Overview 11.22.21,
presented to the Child Services Oversight Committee on November 22, 2021.  
Fiscal Analyst: Karen Rossen,  317-234-2106.
SB 266	2