Indiana 2022 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0418 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/24/2022

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 7237	NOTE PREPARED: May 24, 2022
BILL NUMBER: SB 418 (ts) 	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Conflict Resolution and Technical Corrections.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Messmer	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: No Fiscal Impact
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill resolves conflicts occurring in the following: (1) SEA 37-2022 and HEA
1075-2022. (2) SEA 37-2022 and SEA 382-2022. (3) SEA 294-2022 and HEA 1296-2022. (4) HEA
1174-2022 and HEA 1314-2022. (5) SEA 119-2022 and HEA 1260-2022. (6) SEA 382-2022 and HEA
1251-2022. (7) SEA 382-2022 and HEA 1002-2022. (8) HEA 1169-2022 and HEA 1245-2022. (9) SEA
37-2022 and HEA 1245-2022. (10) SEA 356-2022 and HEA 1251-2022. (11) SEA 290-2022 and HEA
1093-2022. (12) SEA 80-2022 and HEA 1300-2022. (13) SEA 149-2022 and HEA 1260-2022. 
The bill makes technical corrections in various enrolled acts as follows: (1) Removes extraneous provisions
inadvertently left in HEA 1262-2022 and HEA 1137-2022. (2) Corrects the name of the International
Chiropractors Association in a provision added by SEA 239-2022. (3) Inserts a phrase inadvertently omitted
from SEA 388-2022. (4) Corrects cross references in HEA 1003-2022. 
The bill specifies the General Assembly's intent regarding IC 34-30-2 and conflicts occurring in SEA 5-2022,
SEA 80-2022, and HEA 1260-2022.
Effective Date: March 13, 2020 (retroactive); March 18, 2022 (retroactive); April 1, 2022 (retroactive); July.
1, 2022; January 1, 2023; July 1, 2023.
Explanation of State Expenditures: 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
SB 418 (ts)	1 Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jessica Harmon,  317-232-9854.
SB 418 (ts)	2