Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1067 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/04/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6713	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 27, 2023
BILL NUMBER: HB 1067	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: IDD Task Force.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Clere	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill requires the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other
Developmental Disabilities Task Force (task force) to establish a subcommittee to make recommendations
to the task force regarding the Medicaid buy-in program and benefit related barriers to employment for
individuals with intellectual and developmental disabilities. It requires the task force to establish the
subcommittee not later than May 1, 2024. It requires the subcommittee to prepare and submit
recommendations to the task force not later than October 1, 2024.
This bill changes the expiration date of the task force from December 31, 2025, to December 31, 2024. It also
requires the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services to provide quarterly updates to the Division
of Disability and Rehabilitative Services Advisory Council regarding the implementation of
recommendations made by the task force.
Effective Date:  Upon passage; January 1, 2025.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Between January 1, 2025 and December 31, 2027, the bill requires the
Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services (DDRS) to provide quarterly updates to the Division of
Disability and Rehabilitative Services Advisory Council regarding implementation of the recommendations
made by the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other Developmental Disabilities Task Force (task
force) per IC 12-11-15.5. This requirement is within the routine administrative functions of the DDRS and
should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming near customary agency
staffing and resource levels.
The task force must establish a new subcommittee to make certain recommendations to the full task force
HB 1067	1 by October 1, 2024. This will result in additional per diem and travel expenses depending on the total number
of members appointed to the subcommittee. The bill also moves the sunset date for the task force from
December 31, 2025 to December 31, 2024, which will result in fewer task force meetings. Any change in
total expenditures of the task force will depend on the increased cost for holding meetings of the new
subcommittee and the reduced cost of holding fewer meetings of the full task force.
Additional Information: The task force was established in 2017 and generally meets twice per year. It
consists of 21 members, of which four are legislators, eight are lay members, and nine are state employees.
For members of the task force, as of January 2024, legislator per diem is $196, lay member per diem is $100,
and state employees receive no per diem. Task force members who are legislators receive travel
reimbursement of $0.67 per mile, while lay members and members who are state employees receive $0.49
per mile.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services, Family and Social Services
Administration.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jason Barrett,  317-232-9809.
HB 1067	2