Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1067 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/05/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6713	NOTE PREPARED: Mar 5, 2024
BILL NUMBER: HB 1067	BILL AMENDED: Mar 4, 2024
SUBJECT: IDD Task Force and Program Oversight Boards. 
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Clere	BILL STATUS: As Passed Senate
FIRST SPONSOR: Sen. Bohacek
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill amends the membership of and provisions concerning: (1) the Indiana
State Commission on Aging; and (2) the Community and Home Options to Institutional Care for the Elderly
and Disabled Board.
This bill requires the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other Developmental Disabilities Task
Force (task force) to establish, not later than May 1, 2024, a subcommittee to make recommendations to the
task force regarding the Medicaid buy-in program and benefit related barriers to employment for individuals
with intellectual and developmental disabilities. It requires the subcommittee to prepare and submit
recommendations to the task force not later than October 1, 2024. It changes the expiration date of the task
force from December 31, 2025, to December 31, 2024. It also requires the Division of Disability and
Rehabilitative Services to provide quarterly updates to the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services
Advisory Council regarding the implementation of recommendations made by the task force.
Effective Date:  Upon passage; January 1, 2025.
Explanation of State Expenditures: IDD Task Force: Between January 1, 2025, and December 31, 2027,
the bill requires the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services (DDRS) to provide quarterly updates
to the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services Advisory Council regarding implementation of the
recommendations made by the Services for Individuals with Intellectual and Other Developmental
Disabilities Task Force per IC 12-11-15.5. This requirement is within the routine administrative functions
of the DDRS and should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming near
customary agency staffing and resource levels.
HB 1067	1 The task force must establish a new subcommittee to make certain recommendations to the full task force
by October 1, 2024. This will result in additional per diem and travel expenses depending on the total number
of members appointed to the subcommittee. The bill also moves the sunset date for the task force from
December 31, 2025 to December 31, 2024, which will result in fewer task force meetings. Any change in
total expenditures of the task force will depend on the increased cost for holding meetings of the new
subcommittee and the reduced cost of holding fewer meetings of the full task force.
Commission on Aging: This bill modifies the makeup of the Commission on Aging and requires that the
Executive Director of the Indiana Housing and Community Development Authority (IHCDA) be a
Commission member. (This bill does not change the number of Commission members. All members of the
Commission receive per diem and travel reimbursement.) Serving on the Commission is within the routine
administrative functions of the IHCDA and should be able to be implemented with no additional
appropriations, assuming near customary agency staffing and resource levels.
CHOICE Board: This bill expands the Community and Home Options to Institutional Care for the Elderly
and Disabled (CHOICE) Board from 15 to 17 members, adding to the Board one lay member and the
Executive Director of the IHCDA. Each Board members who is not a state employee is entitled to $100 per
diem and travel reimbursement for each meeting. Each member who is a state employee is entitled to travel
reimbursement but does not receive per diem. Serving on the CHOICE Board is within the routine
administrative functions of the IHCDA and should be able to be implemented with no additional
appropriations, assuming near customary agency staffing and resource levels.
Governor Appointments: The bill requires the Governor to appoint new members to the Commission on
Aging and to appoint a member to the CHOICE Board. This is within the Governor’s routine administrative
functions and should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming near customary
staffing and resource levels.
Additional Information: The IDD Task Force was established in 2017 and generally meets twice per year.
It consists of 21 members, of which four are legislators, eight are lay members, and nine are state employees.
For members of the task force, as of January 2024, legislator per diem is $196, lay member per diem is $100,
and state employees receive no per diem. Task force members who are legislators receive travel
reimbursement of $0.67 per mile, while lay members and members who are state employees receive $0.49
per mile.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services, Family and Social Services
Administration; Indiana Housing and Community Development Authority; Governor’s Office.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jason Barrett,  317-232-9809.
HB 1067	2