Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1121 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/04/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6566	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 21, 2023
BILL NUMBER: HB 1121	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Local Income Taxes.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Thompson	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill extends the expiration of provisions concerning a county with a single
voting bloc and the allocation of votes for a local income tax council. It specifies the amount of revenue from
a local income tax rate imposed for correctional facilities and rehabilitation facilities in a county that may
be used for operating expenses of those facilities.
Effective Date:  Upon passage; July 1, 2023 (retroactive).
Explanation of State Expenditures: 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Local Income Tax Councils: The bill’s provisions extend the current
expiration date by one year - from May 31, 2024, to May 31, 2025 - for those counties where the county
adopting body is the local income tax council and the county has a single voting bloc. These provisions
should not have any significant impact for the local units since they’re simply extending current functions
already in place.
Explanation of Local Revenues: Correctional Facilities LIT: The bill’s provisions clarify the percentage
of revenue generated from a county’s LIT rate imposed for correctional facilities and rehabilitation facilities
in a county that may be used for operating expenses of those facilities. Under current law, the amount of a
county’s correctional facilities LIT revenue that can be used towards operating expenses is equal to the
amount of revenue attributable to 0.2% of the tax rate. Under this bill’s provisions, if an increment of the tax
rate does not exceed 0.2%, 100% of the revenue collected from the total tax rate can be used towards
HB 1121	1 operating expenses. This bill’s provisions will allow those counties that impose a LIT rate for correctional
and rehabilitation facilities to use more of the revenue generated from the rate towards operational costs at
these facilities (as opposed to capital construction costs and debt costs associated with the construction of
the facilities).   
The table shown at the end of this fiscal note provides a list of counties that have imposed a LIT rate in CY
2024 for correctional and rehabilitation facilities. The table also includes the CY 2024 certified distributions
amounts, certified rates, and estimated amounts of revenue that could be used toward operating expenses
under the current statute (Baseline) and under this bill’s provisions (Policy). A difference (between Policy
vs. Baseline amounts) column is also included.  
State Agencies Affected: 
Local Agencies Affected: Local Income Tax Councils; Counties.
Information Sources: State Budget Agency Estimated CY 2024 Certified Distributions (Certified November
28, 2023): https://www.in.gov/sba/files/2024-Certification-Calculations-2.pdf. 
Fiscal Analyst: James Johnson, 317-232-9869.
CY 2024 Local Income Tax: Correctional Facilities Distributions Amounts & Rates
HB 1121	2 County Certified
Distributions
Certified RateBaseline: Allowable
Amount for Operating
Expenses
Policy: Allowable
Amount for Operating
Expenses
Difference:
Policy vs.
Baseline
Allen $16,294,833 0.1100%	$3,585 $16,294,833 $16,291,248 
Bartholomew $5,938,249 0.2000%	$2,375 $5,938,249 $5,935,874 
Boone $8,986,228 0.2000%	$3,594 $8,986,228 $8,982,634 
Carroll $1,126,768 0.2000%	$451 $1,126,768 $1,126,317 
Cass $1,700,561 0.2000%	$680 $1,700,561 $1,699,881 
Clinton $1,607,429 0.2000%	$643 $1,607,429 $1,606,786 
Dearborn $3,090,722 0.2000%	$1,236 $3,090,722 $3,089,486 
DeKalb $2,042,601 0.1300%	$531 $2,042,601 $2,042,070 
Dubois $3,288,224 0.2000%	$1,315 $3,288,224 $3,286,909 
Fayette $926,083 0.2000%	$370 $926,083 $925,713 
Floyd $5,850,783 0.2000%	$2,340 $5,850,783 $5,848,443 
Fulton $1,019,815 0.2000%	$408 $1,019,815 $1,019,407 
Gibson $2,161,342 0.2000%	$865 $2,161,342 $2,160,477 
Greene $1,523,400 0.2000%	$609 $1,523,400 $1,522,791 
Hancock $6,085,164 0.2000%	$2,434 $6,085,164 $6,082,730 
Hendricks $13,614,448 0.2000%	$5,446 $13,614,448 $13,609,003 
Henry $2,252,765 0.2000%	$901 $2,252,765 $2,251,864 
Howard $4,447,663 0.2000%	$1,779 $4,447,663 $4,445,884 
Huntington $2,215,414 0.2000%	$886 $2,215,414 $2,214,528 
Jackson $2,357,877 0.2000%	$943 $2,357,877 $2,356,934 
Jefferson $2,594,555 0.3000%	$1,557 $1,729,703 $1,728,147 
Johnson $11,830,592 0.2000%	$4,732 $11,830,592 $11,825,860 
Knox $1,967,254 0.2000%	$787 $1,967,254 $1,966,467 
Madison $6,282,278 0.2000%	$2,513 $6,282,278 $6,279,765 
Monroe $424,260 0.0100%	$8 $424,260 $424,252 
Morgan $860,433 0.0400%	$69 $860,433 $860,364 
Owen $985,717 0.2000%	$394 $985,717 $985,323 
Putnam $1,870,558 0.2000%	$748 $1,870,558 $1,869,810 
Ripley $1,676,952 0.2000%	$671 $1,676,952 $1,676,281 
Sullivan $952,188 0.2000%	$381 $952,188 $951,807 
Vanderburgh $2,726,363 0.0500%	$273 $2,726,363 $2,726,091 
Vigo $5,265,507 0.2000%	$2,106 $5,265,507 $5,263,401 
Wabash $1,956,048 0.2000%	$782 $1,956,048 $1,955,266 
Wells $614,635 0.0700%	$86 $614,635 $614,549 
Whitley $2,300,473 0.2000%	$920 $2,300,473 $2,299,553 
HB 1121	3