LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS 200 W. Washington St., Suite 301 Indianapolis, IN 46204 (317) 233-0696 iga.in.gov FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT LS 6547 NOTE PREPARED: Feb 29, 2024 BILL NUMBER: HB 1216 BILL AMENDED: Feb 29, 2024 SUBJECT: Medicaid Reimbursement for Certain Detainees. FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Steuerwald BILL STATUS: CR Adopted - 2 nd House FIRST SPONSOR: Sen. Johnson T FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL IMPACT: State DEDICATED XFEDERAL Summary of Legislation: (Amended) The bill removes provisions in current law specifying that services provided to an individual while the individual is committed to a facility for mental health services are medically necessary when provided in accordance with generally accepted clinical care guidelines. It requires Medicaid reimbursement for Medicaid covered services provided to a Medicaid recipient while the individual is detained to a facility for mental health services. It amends the requirements for an application for detention. The bill sunsets this provision on June 30, 2025. The bill also requires, on or before February 1, 2025, the Office of the Secretary of Family and Social Services to report to the Budget Committee certain information for Medicaid claims data ranging from July 1, 2024, to December 31, 2024. Effective Date: (Amended) July 1, 2024. Explanation of State Expenditures: (Revised) The bill will have an indeterminate, but potentially significant increase in state Medicaid costs for the duration of the program to provide services for Medicaid eligible individuals in emergency detention and pursuant to a final court order. The bill requires the state to pay for all services provided to such individuals without regard to medical necessity criteria. The potential increase is indeterminate because the Office of the Secretary of Family and Social Services (FSSA) does not track the legal status of individuals entering care on an emergency basis. (Revised) The FSSA will have an increased workload and expenditures to provide a report concerning Medicaid claims between July 1, 2024, and December 31, 2024. Also, the FSSA will have a one-time increase in workload to establish a system to track claims to which these provisions apply. HB 1216 1 Additional Information - In CY 2022, a total of 19,035 new emergency detention, temporary commitment, and regular commitment cases were opened, and 4,924 were dismissed indicating that the defendant either was discharged, chose voluntary admission, or the case was transferred to another county for involuntary commitment. No distinction is made as to how many of these cases were considered as emergency detention. [If additional information becomes available from the Office of Court Services, this fiscal note will be updated.] Since FSSA does not receive information on the legal status of a detainee, it is not possible to compare the services that would be provided under the bill with the services currently reimbursed by the FSSA for people in emergency detention. Also, often at the same time as a facility is pursuing emergency detention through the courts, FSSA’s managed care entities or fee-for-service authorization managers are determining the level of care and medical necessity that make up the reimbursement for the stay. The determination may not match the services provided. Explanation of State Revenues: Explanation of Local Expenditures: Explanation of Local Revenues: State Agencies Affected: Office of the Secretary, Division of Mental Health and Addiction; Budget Committee. Local Agencies Affected: Information Sources: Indiana Supreme Court, Indiana Office of Court Services, Quarterly Case Status Reports Instructions, August 2023; ICOR Trial Court Statistics accessed December 22, 2023; Keith McConomy, Ann Zerr, and Katrina Etter, FSSA. Fiscal Analyst: Karen Rossen, 317-234-2106. HB 1216 2