Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1250 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/09/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6957	NOTE PREPARED: Jan 7, 2024
BILL NUMBER: HB 1250	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Elections in Small Cities and Towns.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Criswell	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill repeals provisions concerning municipal elections in small towns located
outside Marion County, including provisions that allow for the creation of a town election board. The bill
provides that a municipal election in a certain town or city with a population of less than 3,500 may be held
only in an even-numbered year and only at the same time as a primary or general election. The bill requires
the county election board to conduct the elections. The bill specifies that an officeholder in a municipality
whose term was scheduled to expire on November 2, 2027, is entitled to remain in office until a successor
is elected on November 7, 2028, qualified, and begins the successor's term on January 1, 2029. The bill
makes conforming amendments.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: The Election Division would likely need to update their publications
and possibly some election forms to conform with the bill’s requirements. It is likely the Division would be
able to make the necessary updates as a routine matter of business.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Summary: Under the bill, municipal elections in the municipalities
described under the bill would be eliminated. Offices in those municipalities would be elected in even-
numbered years from 2028 on. There would be a cost savings to municipalities under the proposal. Although
ballots would become longer and may increase printing costs, Counties that have run these municipality’s
elections, may experience savings from pollworker and ballot costs in certain circumstances.
HB 1250	1 Those municipalities that were paying the county to run their municipal election would experience a savings
as the bill would not require them to pay the county to run their elections in even years.
Additional Information– Under current law, county election boards are required, with some exceptions, to
conduct a municipal primary and election. Unless a different agreement has been made, expenses from
county-operated municipal elections are reimbursed by the municipality to the county. If the expenses of a
municipal primary or election cannot be directly attributed to a single municipality, the expenses are
apportioned 25% to the county and 75% to the municipalities in the county holding an election.
A 2023 survey conducted by the Association of Indiana Counties with 65 county repondents found that
precinct inspectors, judges, and clerks averaged per diems of $178, $142, and $136 respectfully for their
service on election day. Meal allowances ranged from $10 to $35.     
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Election Division. 
Local Agencies Affected: County election boards. 
Information Sources: Indiana Association of Counties, election poll worker survey, for the LSA, conducted
September and October 2023.
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker,  317-232-9851.
HB 1250	2