Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1337 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/22/2024

                    *HB1337.1*
January 22, 2024
HOUSE BILL No. 1337
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1337 (Updated January 22, 2024 12:38 pm - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 32-25.5.
Synopsis:  Preemption of HOA regulation of beekeeping. Sets forth a
homeowners association's ability to regulate beekeeping on properties
subject to covenants of the homeowners association.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Engleman, Clere
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
Development.
January 22, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
HB 1337—LS 7055/DI 150  January 22, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1337
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
property.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 32-25.5-3.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 3.7. Homeowners Association Regulation of Beekeeping
5 Sec. 1. Subject to section 3 of this chapter, a homeowners
6 association may adopt regulations concerning the:
7 (1) number of active beehives a person may maintain; and
8 (2) location of beehives;
9 on a property subject to covenants of the homeowners association
10 that a person owns, rents, or leases.
11 Sec. 2. Regulations adopted by a homeowners association must
12 be consistent with:
13 (1) IC 14-24-8; and
14 (2) any rules adopted under IC 14-24-3.
15 Sec. 3. A homeowners association may not prohibit a person
16 from beekeeping on a property subject to covenants of the
17 homeowners association that the person owns, rents, or leases if
HB 1337—LS 7055/DI 150 2
1 both of the following apply:
2 (1) The beehives are actively maintained for the production of
3 honey.
4 (2) The person who is beekeeping complies with:
5 (A) IC 14-24-8; and
6 (B) any rules adopted under IC 14-24-3.
HB 1337—LS 7055/DI 150 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Agriculture and Rural
Development, to which was referred House Bill 1337, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1337 as introduced.) 
AYLESWORTH
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0         
HB 1337—LS 7055/DI 150