Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1337 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/26/2024

                    *EH1337.1*
February 27, 2024
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1337
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1337 (Updated February 22, 2024 12:46 pm - DI 87)
Citations Affected:  IC 32-25.5.
Synopsis:  HOA regulation of beekeeping. Provides that a homeowners
association may regulate the number and location of beehives on
properties. Provides that a homeowners association may not: (1)
regulate the number and location of beehives that are located on a
property before the regulations are adopted; and (2) prohibit
beekeeping on property that complies with state law, if the beehives are
actively maintained for pollination or production of honey.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Engleman, Clere, Heine, Klinker
(SENATE SPONSOR — BALDWIN)
January 10, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
Development.
January 22, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
January 25, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 29, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 78, nays 18.
SENATE ACTION
February 5, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
February 26, 2024, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
EH 1337—LS 7055/DI 150  February 27, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1337
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
property.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 32-25.5-3.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 3.7. Homeowners Association Regulation of Beekeeping
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "governing documents" has the
6 meaning set forth in IC 32-25.5-2-3.
7 Sec. 2. This chapter applies only to a homeowners association's
8 adoption or amendment of governing documents after June 30,
9 2024.
10 Sec. 3. Except as provided in section 4 of this chapter, and
11 subject to section 6 of this chapter, a homeowners association may
12 adopt or amend governing documents to regulate the:
13 (1) number; and
14 (2) location;
15 of active beehives that a person may maintain on a property that
16 a person owns, rents, or leases.
Sec. 4. 17	This section applies only to a person who has active
EH 1337—LS 7055/DI 150 2
1 beehives located on a property before the date the homeowners
2 association adopts or amends the governing documents. This
3 chapter does not allow a homeowners association to prevent a
4 person from maintaining the same:
5 (1) number; and
6 (2) location;
7 of active beehives that are on the property before the date the
8 governing documents are adopted or amended.
9 Sec. 5. Any regulation by a homeowners association must be
10 consistent with:
11 (1) IC 14-24-8; and
12 (2) any rules adopted under IC 14-24-3.
13 Sec. 6. A homeowners association may not prohibit a person
14 from beekeeping on a property that the person owns, rents, or
15 leases if both of the following apply:
16 (1) The beehives are actively maintained for pollination or the
17 production of honey.
18 (2) The person who is beekeeping complies with:
19 (A) IC 14-24-8; and
20 (B) any rules adopted under IC 14-24-3.
EH 1337—LS 7055/DI 150 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Agriculture and Rural
Development, to which was referred House Bill 1337, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1337 as introduced.) 
AYLESWORTH
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0         
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
which was referred House Bill No. 1337, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Page 1, delete lines 5 through 10, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "governing documents" has the
meaning set forth in IC 32-25.5-2-3.
Sec. 2. This chapter applies only to a homeowners association's
adoption or amendment of governing documents after June 30,
2024.
Sec. 3. Except as provided in section 4 of this chapter, and
subject to section 6 of this chapter, a homeowners association may
adopt or amend governing documents to regulate the:
(1) number; and
(2) location;
of active beehives that a person may maintain on a property that
a person owns, rents, or leases.
Sec. 4. This section applies only to a person who has active
beehives located on a property before the date the homeowners
association adopts or amends the governing documents. This
chapter does not allow a homeowners association to prevent a
person from maintaining the same:
(1) number; and
(2) location;
of active beehives that are on the property before the date the
governing documents are adopted or amended.".
Page 1, line 11, delete "Sec. 2. Regulations adopted" and insert
"Sec. 5. Any regulation".
Page 1, line 15, delete "3." and insert "6.".
EH 1337—LS 7055/DI 150 4
Page 1, line 16, delete "subject to covenants of the".
Page 1, line 17, delete "homeowners association".
Page 2, line 2, delete "for" and insert "for pollination or".
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to HB 1337 as printed January 22, 2024.)
BUCK, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 1.
EH 1337—LS 7055/DI 150