Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1371 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/10/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6792	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 29, 2023
BILL NUMBER: HB 1371	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Carbaugh	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
XDEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: Administering Anesthesia– The bill allows a certified registered nurse anesthetist
(CRNA) to administer anesthesia under the direction of and in the immediate presence of a podiatrist or
dentist. (Under current law, a CRNA may administer anesthesia under the direction of and in the immediate
presence of a physician.) 
Civil Immunity– The bill provides that a physician, podiatrist, or dentist is not liable for any act or omission
of a CRNA who administers anesthesia. It makes corresponding changes.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Administering Anesthesia– The bill may require a one-time change to
rules and information provided by the State Board of Dentistry and the Professional Licensing Agency (PLA)
regarding CRNAs during the first year of implementation. This requirement should be able to be
accomplished within regularly scheduled board meetings. This is within the PLA’s routine administrative
functions and should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming near customary
agency staffing and resource levels.
In future years, the Medical Licensing Board and the State Board of Nursing may see a reduction in workload
if fewer disciplinary hearings were to occur as a result of the bill.
Additional Information– As of June 30, 2023, there were 9,996 active nurses with a CSR prescriptive
authority, an increase of 1,030 CSR’s from June 30, 2022.
HB 1371	1 Explanation of State Revenues: Immunity– This provision could slightly reduce court filing fees if fewer
cases are filed as a result of the bill.
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Immunity– This provision could reduce local expenditures by reducing
court costs from fewer civil cases filed.
Explanation of Local Revenues: Immunity– This provision could reduce local revenues from court fees if
fewer cases are filed in local courts of record.
State Agencies Affected: Medical Licensing Board, State Board of Nursing, State Board of Dentistry,
Professional Licensing Agency.
Local Agencies Affected: Trial courts.
Information Sources: Professional Licensing Agency, licensing data FY 2023.
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker,  317-232-9851.
HB 1371	2