Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0015 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/16/2024

                    *SB0015.1*
January 17, 2024
SENATE BILL No. 15
_____
DIGEST OF SB 15 (Updated January 16, 2024 10:30 am - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 22-2.
Synopsis:  Veterans' benefits and services poster. Requires that the
Indiana department of labor consult with the Indiana department of
veterans' affairs to create and distribute a veterans' benefits and
services poster. Provides that the veterans' benefits and services poster
must contain certain information. Requires that Indiana employers with
more than 50 full-time employees (or their equivalent) display the
veterans' benefits and services poster in a conspicuous place.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Tomes, Niezgodski
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The
Military.
January 16, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 15—LS 6125/DI 153  January 17, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 15
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning labor
and safety.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 22-2-19 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 19. Veterans' Benefits and Services Information
5 Sec. 1. (a) As used in this chapter, "department of labor" refers
6 to the department of labor created by IC 22-1-1-1.
7 (b) As used in this chapter, "department of veterans' affairs"
8 refers to the Indiana department of veterans' affairs established by
9 IC 10-17-1-2.
10 Sec. 2. The department of labor shall consult with the
11 department of veterans' affairs to create and distribute to
12 employers described in section 4 of this chapter a veterans' benefits
13 and services poster.
14 Sec. 3. The poster described in section 2 of this chapter must
15 contain:
16 (1) information concerning benefits and services available to
17 veterans, including:
SB 15—LS 6125/DI 153 2
1 (A) substance abuse and mental health treatment;
2 (B) federal disability compensation;
3 (C) educational resources;
4 (D) employment and reemployment rights;
5 (E) tax credits, exemptions, and refunds;
6 (F) Indiana veteran driver's licenses and photo
7 identification cards;
8 (G) free or low cost legal assistance; and
9 (H) minority veteran resources; and
10 (2) contact information for the following:
11 (A) The United States Department of Veterans Affairs.
12 (B) The department of veterans' affairs.
13 (C) The Veterans Crisis Line.
14 Sec. 4. Every employer under the jurisdiction of the department
15 of labor with more than fifty (50) full-time employees (or their
16 equivalent) shall display the poster distributed under section 2 of
17 this chapter in a conspicuous place where employees are employed.
SB 15—LS 6125/DI 153 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Veterans Affairs and
The Military, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 15, has had the
same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 15 as introduced.)
           
TOMES, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0
SB 15—LS 6125/DI 153