Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0049 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/21/2023

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 49
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 14-8-2-37.2; IC 14-22-11-18.
Synopsis:  Catastrophically disabled veteran hunting. Provides that
catastrophically disabled veterans may hunt on the same free hunting
days as those designated for youth hunters by the director of the
department of natural resources. Defines "catastrophically disabled".
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Glick
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources.
2024	IN 49—LS 6269/DI 150 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 49
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
natural and cultural resources.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 14-8-2-37.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 37.2. "Catastrophically disabled", for purposes of
4 IC 14-22-11-18, has the meaning set forth in IC 14-22-11-18.
5 SECTION 2. IC 14-22-11-18, AS AMENDED BY THE
6 TECHNICAL CORRECTIONS BILL OF THE 2024 GENERAL
7 ASSEMBLY, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
8 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 18. (a) As used in this section, "catastrophically
9 disabled" has the meaning set forth in 38 CFR 17.36(e) as in effect
10 January 1, 2023.
11 (a) (b) The director may designate not more than four (4) days each
12 year as free hunting days for youth hunters and catastrophically
13 disabled veterans.
14 (b) (c) During a free hunting day for youth hunters and
15 catastrophically disabled veterans designated under subsection (a),
16 (b), a resident who is less than eighteen (18) years of age or a resident
2024	IN 49—LS 6269/DI 150 2
1 who is a catastrophically disabled veteran may:
2 (1) hunt using hunting methods that are designated by the director
3 and that are legal for that hunting season; and
4 (2) exercise the same privileges that a resident is entitled to under
5 IC 14-22-12-1(24). IC 14-22-12-1(a)(24) for a youth hunter or
6 IC 14-22-12-1(a) for a catastrophically disabled veteran.
7 A youth hunter or a catastrophically disabled veteran is not required
8 to pay a fee or possess a hunting license.
9 (c) (d) A youth hunter who hunts during a free hunting day for youth
10 hunters under this section must:
11 (1) comply with the conditions and rules adopted by the director;
12 and
13 (2) be accompanied by an individual who:
14 (A) is at least eighteen (18) years of age; and
15 (B) holds a valid hunting license under IC 14-22-12 or is not
16 required to have a hunting license under this chapter.
17 (d) (e) The individual under subsection (c)(2) (d)(2) who
18 accompanies the youth hunter:
19 (1) must be in close enough proximity to monitor the youth
20 hunter's activities and communicate with the youth hunter at all
21 times; and
22 (2) may assist the youth hunter, including calling, but may not
23 carry a firearm or bow and arrow.
24 (f) A catastrophically disabled veteran who hunts during a free
25 hunting day under this section must:
26 (1) comply with the conditions and rules adopted by the
27 director; and
28 (2) be accompanied by an individual who is at least eighteen
29 (18) years of age.
30 (g) The individual under subsection (f)(2) who accompanies a
31 catastrophically disabled veteran:
32 (1) is not required to hold a valid hunting license under
33 IC 14-22-12 or to have a hunting license under this chapter;
34 (2) must be in close enough proximity to monitor the
35 catastrophically disabled veteran's activities and
36 communicate with the catastrophically disabled veteran at all
37 times; and
38 (3) may assist the catastrophically disabled veteran, including
39 calling, but may not carry a firearm or bow and arrow.
2024	IN 49—LS 6269/DI 150