*ES0049.1* February 22, 2024 ENGROSSED SENATE BILL No. 49 _____ DIGEST OF SB 49 (Updated February 21, 2024 11:05 am - DI 140) Citations Affected: IC 14-8; IC 14-22. Synopsis: Catastrophically disabled veteran hunting. Provides that catastrophically disabled veterans may hunt on the same free hunting days as those designated for youth hunters by the director of the department of natural resources. Defines "catastrophically disabled". Effective: July 1, 2024. Glick, Tomes, Niezgodski, Ford J.D., Alexander, Byrne, Qaddoura, Doriot, Baldwin, Crane, Yoder (HOUSE SPONSORS — ABBOTT, ZENT, JUDY, LINDAUER) January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources. January 22, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. January 25, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. January 26, 2024, engrossed. January 30, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 49, nays 0. HOUSE ACTION February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources. February 22, 2024, reported — Do Pass. ES 49—LS 6269/DI 150 February 22, 2024 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED SENATE BILL No. 49 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning natural and cultural resources. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 14-8-2-37.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 37.2. "Catastrophically disabled", for purposes of 4 IC 14-22-11-18, has the meaning set forth in IC 14-22-11-18. 5 SECTION 2. IC 14-22-11-18, AS AMENDED BY THE 6 TECHNICAL CORRECTIONS BILL OF THE 2024 GENERAL 7 ASSEMBLY, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 8 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 18. (a) As used in this section, "catastrophically 9 disabled" has the meaning set forth in 38 CFR 17.36(e) as in effect 10 January 1, 2023. 11 (a) (b) The director may designate not more than four (4) days each 12 year as free hunting days for youth hunters and catastrophically 13 disabled veterans. 14 (b) (c) During a free hunting day for youth hunters and 15 catastrophically disabled veterans designated under subsection (a), 16 (b), a resident who is less than eighteen (18) years of age or a resident ES 49—LS 6269/DI 150 2 1 who is a catastrophically disabled veteran may: 2 (1) hunt using hunting methods that are designated by the director 3 and that are legal for that hunting season; and 4 (2) exercise the same privileges that a resident is entitled to under 5 IC 14-22-12-1(24). IC 14-22-12-1(a)(24) for a youth hunter or 6 IC 14-22-12-1(a) for a catastrophically disabled veteran. 7 A youth hunter or a catastrophically disabled veteran is not required 8 to pay a fee or possess a hunting license. 9 (c) (d) A youth hunter who hunts during a free hunting day for youth 10 hunters under this section must: 11 (1) comply with the conditions and rules adopted by the director; 12 and 13 (2) be accompanied by an individual who: 14 (A) is at least eighteen (18) years of age; and 15 (B) holds a valid hunting license under IC 14-22-12 or is not 16 required to have a hunting license under this chapter. 17 (d) (e) The individual under subsection (c)(2) (d)(2) who 18 accompanies the youth hunter: 19 (1) must be in close enough proximity to monitor the youth 20 hunter's activities and communicate with the youth hunter at all 21 times; and 22 (2) may assist the youth hunter, including calling, but may not 23 carry a firearm or bow and arrow. 24 (f) A catastrophically disabled veteran who hunts during a free 25 hunting day under this section must: 26 (1) comply with the conditions and rules adopted by the 27 director; and 28 (2) be accompanied by an individual who is at least eighteen 29 (18) years of age. 30 (g) The individual under subsection (f)(2) who accompanies a 31 catastrophically disabled veteran: 32 (1) is not required to hold a valid hunting license under 33 IC 14-22-12 or to have a hunting license under this chapter; 34 (2) must be in close enough proximity to monitor the 35 catastrophically disabled veteran's activities and 36 communicate with the catastrophically disabled veteran at all 37 times; and 38 (3) may assist the catastrophically disabled veteran, including 39 calling, but may not carry a firearm or bow and arrow. ES 49—LS 6269/DI 150 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Madam President: The Senate Committee on Natural Resources, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 49, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. (Reference is to SB 49 as introduced.) GLICK, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0 _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Natural Resources, to which was referred Senate Bill 49, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. (Reference is to SB 49 as printed January 23, 2024.) LINDAUER Committee Vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0 ES 49—LS 6269/DI 150