Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0052 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/25/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6297	NOTE PREPARED: Jan 25, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 52	BILL AMENDED: Jan 25, 2024
SUBJECT: Prohibition of Certain Traffic Ordinances. 
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Freeman	BILL STATUS: 2
nd
 Reading - 1
st
 House
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: Traffic Signs: The bill prohibits, until July 1, 2025, a consolidated city from
installing any additional sign prohibiting a turn at a steady red signal. It specifies that the temporary
prohibition does not affect such a sign installed before March 31, 2024. 
Dedicated Lanes: The bill prohibits, until July 1, 2025, a unit of local government from adopting or enforcing
an ordinance, resolution, rule, policy, or other requirement concerning a public transportation project,
including the blue line, that seeks to: (1) convert; (2) restrict; or (3) otherwise establish; a vehicular traffic
lane for use as a dedicated lane. It specifies exclusions from the scope of the temporary prohibition on public
transportation projects. 
Indiana’s Roads for a Stronger, Safer Tomorrow (FIRSST) Task Force: The bill extends the Funding
Indiana's Roads for a Stronger, Safer Tomorrow Task Force (Task Force) for one additional year and adds
new topics for the Task Force to review. It specifies that the Task Force shall provide a report of its findings
and recommendations to the Legislative Council before December 1, 2024.
Effective Date:  Upon passage.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Indiana’s Roads for a Stronger, Safer Tomorrow (FIRSST) Task Force:
The bill reauthorizes the FIRSST Task Force through the end of FY 2024. It also adds two topics for the Task
Force to study. The provision requires the Task Force to submit a report with their findings and
recommendations to Legislative Council before December 1, 2024. Expenditures will depend on how many
meetings are held, the budget established by the Legislative Council, and Task Force membership. In 2023,
the FIRSST Task Force met twice with each meeting costing about $2,500 including mileage reimbursement. 
SB 52	1 Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Dedicated Lanes: The bill prohibits a local unit from incorporating
dedicated lanes into a public transportation project until July 1, 2025. The prohibition does not apply to
projects in which construction is completed by March 31, 2024, or the Indianapolis Public Transportation
Corporation (IndyGo) Purple Line. A local unit may incur additional costs to delay or redesign a public
transportation project if the plan includes a dedicated lane. 
The bill specifies the prohibition includes the Indygo Blue Line. The Blue Line is a bus rapid transit route
that will run between Cumberland and the Indianapolis International Airport along Washington Street and
I-70. The design is expected to be complete in early 2024 with construction beginning in early 2025. The
project is estimated to cost between $370 M and $390 M. 
Traffic Signs: The provision affecting traffic signs in Marion County should have no fiscal impact.
Explanation of Local Revenues:  If an approved application for a transportation project must be resubmitted
to the U.S. Department of Transportation, there is the potential that the amount of funding already committed
to a project will be revised.
State Agencies Affected: General Assembly; Office of Management and Budget; State Budget Agency;
Indiana Finance Authority. 
Local Agencies Affected: All local units except townships. 
Information Sources: https://www.indygo.net/blue-line/
Fiscal Analyst: Heath Holloway,  317-232-9867.
SB 52	2