Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0097 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/21/2023

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 97
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 25-17.6-5-5.
Synopsis:  Continuing education for professional geologists. Specifies
that the renewal of a professional geologist license after June 30, 2025,
requires continuing education.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Zay
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology.
2024	IN 97—LS 6078/DI 153 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 97
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
professions and occupations.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 25-17.6-5-5, AS ADDED BY P.L.108-2022,
2 SECTION 11, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 5. (a) Before July 1, 2024, the board shall adopt
4 rules in accordance with IC 25-1-4 to:
5 (1) require a licensed professional geologist to obtain continuing
6 education in geological sciences as a condition of license renewal;
7 and
8 (2) set forth the conditions, requirements, and implementation of
9 the continuing education program.
10 (b) The continuing education requirements adopted under this
11 section must allow a licensed professional geologist to receive full
12 credit for continuing education courses completed in a state other than
13 Indiana.
14 (c) The continuing education requirements adopted under this
15 section do not apply to a licensed professional geologist until after the
16 first full license renewal cycle beginning one (1) year after final
17 adoption of the rules under this section. In order to renew a license
2024	IN 97—LS 6078/DI 153 2
1 after June 30, 2025, a professional geologist must comply with the
2 continuing education requirements adopted under this section.
3 (d) The continuing education requirements adopted under this
4 section do not apply to a person who is not licensed under this article.
2024	IN 97—LS 6078/DI 153