Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0097 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 12/21/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6078	NOTE PREPARED: Oct 23, 2023
BILL NUMBER: SB 97	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Continuing Education for Professional Geologists.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Zay	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: The bill specifies that the renewal of a professional geologist license after June
30, 2025, requires continuing education.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Summary– The Indiana Board of Licensure for Professional Geologists
(Board) would have to notify licensed geologists that will be at or near their renewal date around July 1,
2025, that they must complete the continuing education (CE) requirements prior to their next renewal
(instead of one year after their next complete license cycle.) Notifying license holders is a routine
administrative function that should be completed within the Board’s existing level of resources.  
Additional Information– Under the requirements of current law, (P.L. 108-2022) the CE requirement would
not become a condition of license renewal until after the first full license renewal cycle that begins one year
after final adoption of the CE rules. Under the bill, the CE requirement would become an immediate
requirement for renewal for all license holders after June 30, 2025. License renewals last for three years.
Explanation of State Revenues: Summary– Under current law, the existing CE requirements are expected
to result in some initial attrition to license renewals. Any potential revenue loss from the bill will occur in
FY 2026. (Under current law, any potential revenue loss would occur within 1 to 3 years after CE rule
adoption.)
  
Additional Information– As of September 15, 2023, there were 1,169 professional geologists licensed by the
board. License fees are $160 for the initial application and $150 for a three-year renewal, paid by the
SB 97	1 applicant directly to Indiana University.
 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Department of Natural Resources; Board of Licensure for Professional Geologists. 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 305 IAC 1-3; https://igws.indiana.edu/lpg/Laws 
Fiscal Analyst: Chris Baker,  317-232-9851.
SB 97	2