Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0148 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/28/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6503	NOTE PREPARED: Feb 28, 2024
BILL NUMBER: SB 148	BILL AMENDED: Feb 28, 2024
SUBJECT: Workforce Data Collection.
FIRST AUTHOR: Sen. Brown L	BILL STATUS: 2
nd
 Reading - 2
nd
 House
FIRST SPONSOR: Rep. Carbaugh
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State & Local
DEDICATED
XFEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: (Amended) Direct Support Professionals: The bill requires the Division of
Disability and Rehabilitative Services, beginning 12 months after the direct support professional registry is
implemented, to post monthly on the division's website the total number of individuals registered under the
registry. It also requires the division to present information concerning the total number of individuals
registered to the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services Advisory Council at least quarterly. 
New Hire Data: The bill requires reports of newly hired employees to be filed electronically. It requires
employers to provide an employee's current primary standardized occupational classification (SOC) code and
starting compensation on a report of a newly hired employee. 
Workforce Data: It provides that each workforce focused agency shall deliver a workforce related program
report to the Management Performance Hub (MPH). The bill requires the MPH to: 
(1) compile the workforce related program reports into an annual data product; and 
(2) make the data product available to each workforce focused agency.
The bill also makes conforming amendments.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: (Revised) Workforce Data: Collecting data from state workforce
focused agencies in a secure manner and compiling the data into a data product would increase workload
and/or expenditures for the MPH. The additional funds and resources required could be supplied through
existing staff and resources currently being used in another program or with new appropriations. Ultimately,
SB 148	1 the source of funds and resources required to satisfy the requirements of this bill will depend on legislative
and administrative actions.
DWD, Department of Education, Commission for Higher Education, Governor’s Workforce Cabinet, and
Family and Social Services Administration (FSSA) will have increased workload and/or expenditures to
collect and submit annual workforce data reports to the MPH. Prior to June 30, 2025, these agencies are
required to establish a data governance team of subject matter experts for workforce related programs,
develop a common set of data elements to collect to be used to evaluate workforce related programs, and
include the collection of the data elements into contracts with service providers entered into or renewed after
June 30, 2024.
New Hire Data: The bill adds information about SOC codes and starting compensation to the reporting
requirements for employers in the Indiana new-hire directory.  It also requires employers to submit the data
electronically. This will require changes to the forms collected from employers and to computer systems.
Since 2017, DWD has contracted with the Stellarware Corporation to develop, administer, and maintain the
Indiana new-hire directory. The current 12-month extension of the contract is for $268,616 and goes through
April 2024. Changing the data collected may require an amendment to the existing contract and may increase
the cost of the contract. The costs of the new-hire directory are split evenly by DWD from federal funds and
the Department of Child Services.
(Revised) Direct Support Professionals: The Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services at FSSA will
have increased workload to post the number of direct support professionals in the registry on its website and
to provide the data to the Division of Disability and Rehabilitative Services Advisory Council.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: Public schools may have increased workload [and/or] expenditures
to collect and submit workforce program data.
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Management Performance Hub; Department of Workforce Development;
Governor’s Workforce Cabinet; Department of Education; Commission for Higher Education; Family and
Social Services Agency.
Local Agencies Affected: Public schools.
Information Sources: DWD. Frequently Asked Questions on New Hire Reporting. 
https://www.in.gov/dwd/files/INNewhireBrochure.pdf; https://www.in-newhire.com/; State of Indiana Public
Contract Search. https://contracts.idoa.in.gov/idoacontractsweb/PUBLIC/106275-000.pdf;
https://contracts.idoa.in.gov/idoacontractsweb/PUBLIC/0000000000000000000021105-004.pdf;
Fiscal Analyst: Camille Tesch, 317-232-5293.
SB 148	2