Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0286 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/13/2024

                    *ES0286.1*
February 13, 2024
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 286
_____
DIGEST OF SB 286 (Updated February 13, 2024 12:24 pm - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 1-2.
Synopsis:  Selection of poet laureate. Amends the membership of the
poet laureate selection committee. Provides that the selection
committee shall meet on a biennial basis or as needed. Provides that a
person selected as poet laureate may serve one additional consecutive
term. Amends the commission's payments for the poet laureate.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Goode, Young M, Alting, Becker,
Niezgodski, Bassler
(HOUSE SPONSORS — CLERE, PFAFF)
January 16, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Policy.
January 25, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 29, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 30, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 49, nays 0.
HOUSE ACTION
February 6, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory
Reform.
February 13, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
ES 286—LS 6683/DI 151  February 13, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 286
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
general provisions.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 1-2-12-4, AS AMENDED BY P.L.2-2007,
2 SECTION 3, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 4. (a) The selection committee consists of the
4 following eight (8) members:
5 (1) Seven (7) members selected by the commission who represent
6 diverse:
7 (A) geographic areas of Indiana; and
8 (B) areas of expertise;
9 including members who represent state educational institutions
10 and private postsecondary educational institutions.
11 (2) The executive director of the commission.
12 (b) The president of each of the institutions selected under
13 subsection (a)(1) shall name a faculty member to serve on the selection
14 committee. The faculty member must:
15 (1) be a member of the fine arts or English department of the
16 institution; and
17 (2) teach writing.
ES 286—LS 6683/DI 151 2
1 (c) (b) The executive director of the commission:
2 (1) is the chair of; and
3 (2) shall establish the meeting times and dates for;
4 the selection committee.
5 SECTION 2. IC 1-2-12-5, AS ADDED BY P.L.164-2005,
6 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
7 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 5. The selection committee shall do the following:
8 (1) Meet on a biennial basis or as needed to select the poet
9 laureate.
10 (2) Determine a method of selecting the poet laureate.
11 (3) Select a poet laureate. not later than December 1 of each
12 odd-numbered year.
13 (4) Subject to section 6 of this chapter, permit a person to be
14 selected as poet laureate even if the person has previously served
15 as poet laureate.
16 SECTION 3. IC 1-2-12-6, AS ADDED BY P.L.164-2005,
17 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
18 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 6. (a) A person selected as poet laureate serves a
19 two (2) year term that begins January 1 following the poet laureate's
20 selection.
21 (b) A person selected as poet laureate may serve one (1)
22 additional consecutive term.
23 SECTION 4. IC 1-2-12-7, AS ADDED BY P.L.164-2005,
24 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
25 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 7. (a) The poet laureate shall do the following:
26 (1) Make a formal appearance at schools, libraries, and other
27 educational facilities.
28 (2) Offer advice to the commission concerning ways to further the
29 art of poetry in Indiana.
30 (3) Represent Indiana and the art of poetry to the education
31 community and the public.
32 (4) Other activities as mutually agreed upon by the poet
33 laureate and the commission.
34 (b) The department of education shall assist the poet laureate in
35 scheduling the poet laureate's appearances in educational facilities and
36 at other appropriate events.
37 SECTION 5. IC 1-2-12-8, AS ADDED BY P.L.164-2005,
38 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
39 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 8. (a) The commission may pay an annual
40 honorarium of two thousand five hundred dollars ($2,500) to the poet
41 laureate an annual honorarium.
42 (b) The commission may pay a per diem to the poet laureate for
ES 286—LS 6683/DI 151 3
1 each day that the poet laureate makes an appearance under this chapter.
2 (c) The commission may pay travel expenses to a member of the
3 selection committee unless the member's institution reimburses the
4 member for the expenses.
5 (b) The commission may pay for poet laureate activities as
6 appropriate.
ES 286—LS 6683/DI 151 4
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Public Policy, to which
was referred Senate Bill No. 286, has had the same under consideration
and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the
recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 286 as introduced.)
           
ALTING, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Government and Regulatory
Reform, to which was referred Senate Bill 286, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to SB 286 as printed January 26, 2024.) 
MILLER D
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0         
ES 286—LS 6683/DI 151