*EH1441.2* Reprinted March 26, 2025 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1441 _____ DIGEST OF HB 1441 (Updated March 25, 2025 2:17 pm - DI 119) Citations Affected: IC 28-1. Synopsis: Bank accounts for foster and emancipated youths. Provides that a foster youth or emancipated youth is legally competent to enter into a contract with a depository financial institution to open a savings or checking account in the youth's name with the consent of a juvenile court with jurisdiction over the youth. Effective: July 1, 2025. Campbell, Dant Chesser, Judy, Meltzer (SENATE SPONSORS — WALKER K, DONATO, HUNLEY, FORD J.D., QADDOURA, RANDOLPH LONNIE M) January 21, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions. February 4, 2025, amended, reported — Do Pass. February 6, 2025, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed. February 7, 2025, engrossed. February 10, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 91, nays 0. SENATE ACTION February 20, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions. March 20, 2025, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass. March 25, 2025, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed. EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119 Reprinted March 26, 2025 First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly. ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL No. 1441 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning financial institutions. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 28-1-1-3.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 3 1, 2025]: Sec. 3.7. For purposes of section 7 of this chapter, 4 "emancipated youth" means an individual who is less than eighteen 5 (18) years of age and has been: 6 (1) granted emancipation; or 7 (2) emancipated by operation of law. 8 SECTION 2. IC 28-1-1-3.9 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 9 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 10 1, 2025]: Sec. 3.9. For purposes of section 7 of this chapter, "foster 11 youth" means an individual who is: 12 (1) at least sixteen (16) years of age; and 13 (2) certified or acknowledged as a foster youth (as defined in 14 IC 31-9-2-47.3) by the department of child services or a 15 designee of the department of child services. 16 SECTION 3. IC 28-1-1-7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 17 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119 2 1 1, 2025]: Sec. 7. For purposes of IC 28-1-23-17, "qualified youth" 2 means an individual who is: 3 (1) a foster youth; or 4 (2) an emancipated youth. 5 SECTION 4. IC 28-1-23-17 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 6 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 7 1, 2025]: Sec. 17. (a) A qualified youth may enter into a contract 8 with a depository financial institution to open a savings or checking 9 account in the qualified youth's name with the consent of a juvenile 10 court with jurisdiction over the qualified youth. 11 (b) A qualified youth who opens a savings or checking account 12 under subsection (a) is: 13 (1) solely responsible for paying all banking-related costs 14 associated with the account; and 15 (2) solely liable for any and all penalties assessed to the 16 qualified youth as the account holder due to the qualified 17 youth's violation of the terms of the account. 18 (c) A qualified youth may not avoid a contract entered into with 19 a depository financial institution under subsection (a) by alleging 20 that the qualified youth was under a legal disability by reason of 21 the qualified youth's age. EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Financial Institutions, to which was referred House Bill 1441, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: Page 1, line 3, delete "IC 28-1-20-5.5" and insert "IC 28-1-23-17". Page 1, line 7, delete "IC 28-1-20-5.5" and insert "IC 28-1-23-17". Page 1, line 9, delete "5.5." and insert "17.". Page 1, line 10, delete "bank or trust company" and insert "depository financial institution". Page 2, line 4, delete "bank or trust company" and insert "depository financial institution". Page 2, line 10, delete "bank or trust company" and insert "depository financial institution". Page 2, line 13, delete "bank or trust company" and insert "depository financial institution". Page 2, line 20, delete "IC 28-1-20-5.5" and insert "IC 28-1-23-17". Page 2, line 21, delete "bank or trust company" and insert "depository financial institution". and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1441 as introduced.) TESHKA Committee Vote: yeas 13, nays 0. _____ HOUSE MOTION Mr. Speaker: I move that House Bill 1441 be amended to read as follows: Page 1, between the enacting clause and line 1, begin a new paragraph and insert: "SECTION 1. IC 28-1-1-3.7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 3.7. For purposes of section 7 of this chapter, "emancipated youth" means an individual who is less than eighteen (18) years of age and has: (1) filed for; or (2) been granted; EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119 4 emancipation.". Page 1, line 3, delete "IC 28-1-23-17," and insert "section 7 of this chapter,". Page 1, between lines 6 and 7, begin a new paragraph and insert: "SECTION 2. IC 28-1-1-7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 7. For purposes of IC 28-1-23-17, "qualified youth" means an individual who is: (1) a foster youth; or (2) an emancipated youth.". Page 1, line 9, delete "foster youth" and insert "qualified youth". Page 1, line 11, delete "foster youth's" and insert "qualified youth's". Page 1, line 14, delete "foster youth" and insert "qualified youth". Page 1, line 15, delete "foster youth" and insert "qualified youth". Page 2, line 2, delete "foster" and insert "qualified". Page 2, line 3, delete "foster youth's" and insert "qualified youth's". Page 2, line 5, delete "foster" and insert "qualified". Page 2, line 7, delete "foster youth" and insert "qualified youth". Page 2, line 13, delete "foster youth" and insert "qualified youth". Page 2, line 16, delete "foster youth's" and insert "qualified youth's". Page 2, line 22, delete "foster" and insert "qualified". Renumber all SECTIONS consecutively. (Reference is to HB 1441 as printed February 4, 2025.) MELTZER _____ COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions, to which was referred House Bill No. 1441, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows: Page 1, delete line 14, begin a new line block indented and insert: "(2) certified or acknowledged as a foster youth (as defined in IC 31-9-2-47.3) by the department of child services or a designee of the department of child services.". Page 2, line 6, delete "is legally competent to" and insert "may". EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119 5 Page 2, delete lines 9 through 11, and insert "consent of a juvenile court with jurisdiction over the qualified youth.". Page 2, delete lines 19 through 38, begin a new paragraph and insert: "(c) A qualified youth may not avoid a contract entered into with a depository financial institution under subsection (a) by alleging that the qualified youth was under a legal disability by reason of the qualified youth's age.". and when so amended that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1441 as reprinted February 7, 2025.) BALDWIN, Chairperson Committee Vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0. _____ SENATE MOTION Mr. President: I move that Engrossed House Bill 1441 be amended to read as follows: Page 1, line 5, delete "has:" and insert "has been: (1) granted emancipation; or (2) emancipated by operation of law.". Page 1, delete lines 6 through 8. (Reference is to EHB 1441 as printed March 21, 2025.) YOUNG M EH 1441—LS 7320/DI 119