Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1626 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/27/2025

                    *HB1626.1*
January 27, 2025
HOUSE BILL No. 1626
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1626 (Updated January 27, 2025 10:43 am - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 31-14; IC 31-17.
Synopsis: Written findings in child custody orders. Requires a court
to include in: (1) a custody order; or (2) an appellate decision affirming
or reversing a custody order; the court's findings of fact and
conclusions of law on which the custody order or appellate decision is
based.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Judy, Jeter, VanNatter
January 21, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
January 27, 2025, reported — Do Pass.
HB 1626—LS 7466/DI 119  January 27, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1626
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
family law and juvenile law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 31-14-13-7.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 7.5. (a) As used in this section,
4 "custody order" means:
5 (1) an order:
6 (A) awarding custody;
7 (B) modifying custody; or
8 (C) denying modification of custody;
9 under this chapter; or
10 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order
11 described in subdivision (1).
12 (b) A court shall include in a custody order the court's findings
13 of fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
14 SECTION 2. IC 31-17-2-8.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
15 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
16 1, 2025]: Sec. 8.2. (a) As used in this section, "custody order"
17 means:
HB 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 2
1 (1) an order:
2 (A) awarding custody;
3 (B) modifying custody; or
4 (C) denying modification of custody;
5 under this chapter; or
6 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order
7 described in subdivision (1).
8 (b) A court shall include in a custody order the court's findings
9 of fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
HB 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Judiciary, to which was referred
House Bill 1626, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said
bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1626 as introduced.) 
JETER
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0         
HB 1626—LS 7466/DI 119