Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1626 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/10/2025

                    *EH1626.2*
Reprinted
March 11, 2025
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1626
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1626 (Updated March 10, 2025 4:04 pm - DI 149)
Citations Affected:  IC 31-14; IC 31-17.
Synopsis:  Child custody orders. Requires the following to be included
in a custody order: (1) a trial court shall include the court's findings of
fact and conclusions of law on which the custody order is based; and
(2) an appellate decision shall include the facts upon which the
appellate court relied to affirm or reverse an order. 
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Judy, Jeter, VanNatter,
Garcia Wilburn
(SENATE SPONSOR — BROWN L)
January 21, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
January 27, 2025, reported — Do Pass.
January 29, 2025, read second time, ordered engrossed.
January 30, 2025, engrossed.
February 3, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 87, nays 2.
SENATE ACTION
February 19, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary.
March 6, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass.
March 10, 2025, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed.
EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119  Reprinted
March 11, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1626
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
family law and juvenile law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 31-14-13-7.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 7.5. (a) As used in this section,
4 "custody order" means:
5 (1) a final order:
6 (A) awarding custody;
7 (B) modifying custody; or
8 (C) denying modification of custody;
9 under this chapter; or
10 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order
11 described in subdivision (1).
12 The term does not include a preliminary order or provisional order
13 awarding custody.
14 (b) The following shall be included in a custody order:
15 (1) A trial court shall include the court's findings of fact and
16 conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
17 (2) An appellate decision shall include the facts upon which
EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 2
1 the appellate court relied to affirm or reverse an order.
2 SECTION 2. IC 31-17-2-8.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
4 1, 2025]: Sec. 8.2. (a) As used in this section, "custody order"
5 means:
6 (1) a final order:
7 (A) awarding custody;
8 (B) modifying custody; or
9 (C) denying modification of custody;
10 under this chapter; or
11 (2) an appellate decision affirming or reversing an order
12 described in subdivision (1).
13 The term does not include a preliminary order or provisional order
14 awarding custody.
15 (b) The following shall be included in a custody order:
16 (1) A trial court shall include the court's findings of fact and
17 conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
18 (2) An appellate decision shall include the facts upon which
19 the appellate court relied to affirm or reverse an order.
EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Judiciary, to which was referred
House Bill 1626, has had the same under consideration and begs leave
to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said
bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1626 as introduced.) 
JETER
Committee Vote: Yeas 12, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Judiciary, to which was
referred House Bill No. 1626, has had the same under consideration
and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with the
recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HB 1626 as printed January 27, 2025.)
           
BROWN L, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0
_____
SENATE MOTION
Mr. President: I move that Engrossed House Bill 1626 be amended
to read as follows:
Page 1, line 5, delete "an" and insert "a final".
Page 1, between lines 11 and 12, begin a new line blocked left and
insert:
"The term does not include a preliminary order or provisional
order awarding custody.".
Page 1, delete lines 12 through 13, begin a new paragraph and
insert:
"(b) The following shall be included in a custody order:
(1) A trial court shall include the court's findings of fact and
conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
(2) An appellate decision shall include the facts upon which
the appellate court relied to affirm or reverse an order.".
Page 2, line 1, delete "an" and insert "a final".
EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119 4
Page 2, between lines 7 and 8, begin a new line blocked left and
insert:
"The term does not include a preliminary order or provisional
order awarding custody.".
Page 2, delete lines 8 through 9, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"(b) The following shall be included in a custody order:
(1) A trial court shall include the court's findings of fact and
conclusions of law on which the custody order is based.
(2) An appellate decision shall include the facts upon which
the appellate court relied to affirm or reverse an order.".
(Reference is to EHB 1626 as printed March 7, 2025.)
FREEMAN
EH 1626—LS 7466/DI 119