Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0008 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2025

                    *HC1013*
April 2, 2025
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 8
DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
Department of Transportation to rename a portion of State Road
56 near French Lick, Indiana, the "Chief Vern Ervin Memorial
Mile".
May, Lauer
(SENATE SPONSOR — KOCH)
January 13, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
January 21, 2025, reported — Do Pass.
January 27, 2025, read second time, passed. Yeas 94, nays 0.
SENATE ACTION
January 30, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation.
April 1, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass.
HC 8—HC 1013/DI 140  April 2, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 8
1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION urging the Indiana
2 Department of Transportation to rename a portion of State Road
3 56 near French Lick, Indiana, the "Chief Vern Ervin Memorial
4 Mile".
5 Whereas, French Lick Chief of Police Vern Ervin was
6 tragically killed on September 10, 1972, at the French Lick
7 Police Station while attempting to quell a domestic dispute; 
8 Whereas, Chief Ervin was a United States Army veteran and
9 served in World War II;
10 Whereas, He had served with the French Lick Police
11 Department for 16 years and had previously served with the
12 Orange County Sheriff's Office for one year; 
13 Whereas, Upon his death, he was survived by his wife, two
14 daughters, one son, three grandsons, and five siblings; 
15 Whereas, Orange County wishes to memorialize Chief Ervin
16 for his bravery and service to both the community of Orange
17 County as a law enforcement officer and to the United States as
18 a war veteran; and
19 Whereas, Chief Vern Ervin's contributions deserve to be
20 commemorated and remembered for generations to come:
21 Therefore,
22 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
23 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
24 the Senate concurring:
HC 8—HC 1013/DI 140 2
1 SECTION 1. That the Indiana General Assembly urges the
2 Indiana Department of Transportation to rename a portion of
3 State Road 56 near French Lick, Indiana, the "Chief Vern Ervin
4 Memorial Mile".
5 SECTION 2. That the Principal Clerk of the House of
6 Representatives shall transmit copies of this resolution to the
7 Commissioner of the Indiana Department of Transportation.
HC 8—HC 1013/DI 140 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Roads and Transportation, to
which was referred House Concurrent Resolution 8, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
House with the recommendation that said resolution do pass. 
(Reference is to HC 8 as printed January 13, 2025.) 
PRESSEL
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0         
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Homeland Security and
Transportation, to which was referred House Concurrent Resolution
No. 8, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report
the same back to the Senate with the recommendation that said
resolution DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HC 8 as printed January 21, 2025.)
           
CRIDER, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0
HC 8—HC 1013/DI 140