Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0040 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/30/2024

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 40
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 14-13-2.
Synopsis:  Little Calumet River basin development commission.
Requires the Little Calumet River basin development commission
(commission) to submit an annual budget to the Lake County council
(council) before September 1 of each year. Provides that, after
December 31, 2025, the commission may not expend money unless
certain conditions are met. Requires the commission to submit an
annual expenditure and activity report to the council before November
1 of each year.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Dernulc, Niemeyer
January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
2025	IN 40—LS 6225/DI 153 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 40
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
natural and cultural resources.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 14-13-2-19 IS AMENDED TO READ AS
2 FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 19. (a) The Little
3 Calumet River project development fund is created. The commission
4 shall make expenditures from the fund only to accomplish the purposes
5 of this chapter and in accordance with section 33 of this chapter.
6 (b) The commission shall do the following:
7 (1) Hold the fund in the name of the commission.
8 (2) Administer the fund.
9 (3) Make all expenditures from the fund.
10 (c) The money in the fund at the end of a fiscal year remains in the
11 fund and does not revert to any other fund.
12 SECTION 2. IC 14-13-2-31, AS AMENDED BY P.L.106-2012,
13 SECTION 18, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
14 JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 31. (a) Subject to subsection (c), before November
15 1 of each year, the commission shall make a report of the commission's
16 activities to the following:
17 (1) The governor.
2025	IN 40—LS 6225/DI 153 2
1 (2) The legislative council.
2 (3) The board of county commissioners of Lake County.
3 (b) A report made to the legislative council under this section must
4 be in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6.
5 (c) The governor may require the commission to issue reports more
6 frequently than would otherwise be required under subsection (a).
7 (d) Before November 1 of each year, the commission shall make
8 a report of the commission's expenditures and activities to the
9 county council of Lake County.
10 SECTION 3. IC 14-13-2-33 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
11 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
12 1, 2025]: Sec. 33. (a) Before September 1 of each year, the
13 commission shall submit a budget to the county council of Lake
14 County for approval.
15 (b) After December 31, 2025, the commission may not expend
16 money, unless the expenditure is:
17 (1) authorized by a budget approved under this section; or
18 (2) otherwise authorized by the county council of Lake
19 County.
2025	IN 40—LS 6225/DI 153