Introduced Version SENATE BILL No. 129 _____ DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-50.2. Synopsis: Landlocked property. Defines "landlocked property" as real property that has been shut off from all public highways as a result of the vacation of one or more public highways. Provides that if an action of the state, or an agency or political subdivision of the state, causes real property to become landlocked property, the county assessor of the county in which the landlocked property is located must assess the value of the landlocked property at zero for as long as the property qualifies as landlocked property if the property owner files an affidavit stating that the property does not have access to any public highway. Effective: January 1, 2025 (retroactive). Buck January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government. 2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129 Introduced First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly. SENATE BILL No. 129 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning taxation. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-50.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE 3 JANUARY 1, 2025 (RETROACTIVE)]: 4 Chapter 50.2. Vacation of a Public Highway Resulting in 5 Landlocked Property 6 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "landlocked property" means 7 real property that has been shut off from all public highways as a 8 result of the vacation of one (1) or more public highways. 9 Sec. 2. If an action of the state, or an agency or political 10 subdivision of the state, causes real property to become landlocked 11 property, the county assessor of the county in which the landlocked 12 property is located must assess the value of the landlocked 13 property at an amount equal to zero (0) for as long as the property 14 qualifies as landlocked property, if the owner of the property 15 complies with section 3 of this chapter. 16 Sec. 3. The county assessor may reduce the assessment of a 17 property under this chapter only if the owner of the property files 2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129 2 1 an affidavit with the county assessor stating that the property does 2 not have access to any public highway as a result of the state or an 3 agency or political subdivision of the state vacating one (1) or more 4 public highways. The affidavit must be signed under oath by the 5 owner of the property. 6 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2025 (RETROACTIVE)] 7 (a) IC 6-1.1-50.2, as added by this act, applies to assessment dates 8 occurring after December 31, 2024. 9 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2028. 10 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act. 2025 IN 129—LS 6549/DI 129