Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0132 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/30/2024

                     
Introduced Version
SENATE BILL No. 132
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 16-19-18.
Synopsis:  Childhood obesity study topics. Establishes the childhood
obesity commission as a temporary commission to study childhood
obesity. Requires the commission to submit an annual report to the
governor and the general assembly not later than June 30, 2026. 
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Ford J.D.
January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children
Services.
2025	IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 132
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
health.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 16-19-18 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2025]:
4 Chapter 18. Childhood Obesity Commission
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "commission" refers to the
6 childhood obesity commission established by section 2 of this
7 chapter.
8 Sec. 2. The childhood obesity commission is established under
9 the executive branch of state government as a temporary
10 commission.
11 Sec. 3. The purpose of the commission is to study childhood
12 obesity and evaluate the following:
13 (1) The state child care licensing structure and quality rating
14 and improvement system (QRIS) as it relates to meeting the
15 following specific standards:
16 (A) Nutrition.
17 (B) Active play.
2025	IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 2
1 (C) Sugary drink.
2 (D) Screen time.
3 (2) Indiana's regulatory systems, as a whole, for robust
4 nutrition or physical activity requirements.
5 (3) The use of a state health savings account to allow
6 individuals to buy fruits and vegetables.
7 (4) Medicaid coverage for the following:
8 (A) Obesity medication.
9 (B) A diabetes prevention program.
10 (C) Exercise prescriptions.
11 (D) Evidence based practices such as food and medicine to
12 produce prescriptions.
13 (5) Indiana's recess requirements for:
14 (A) strengthening physical activity; and
15 (B) increasing minutes for physical activity.
16 (6) Physical education requirements for all grades.
17 (7) Limiting physical education waivers.
18 (8) Any other topic that the commission determines is
19 appropriate.
20 Sec. 4. (a) The commission consists of the following ten (10)
21 members:
22 (1) One (1) individual appointed by the governor who serves
23 as a voting member.
24 (2) Four (4) legislative members serving as nonvoting
25 members appointed as follows:
26 (A) One (1) member appointed by the president pro
27 tempore of the senate.
28 (B) One (1) member appointed by the speaker of the house
29 of representatives.
30 (C) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
31 the senate.
32 (D) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
33 the house of representatives.
34 (3) The chief medical officer for the state department, or the
35 chief medical officer's designee, who serves as a voting
36 member.
37 (4) The secretary of family and social services, or the
38 secretary's designee, who serves as a voting member.
39 (5) The secretary of education, or the secretary's designee,
40 who serves as a voting member.
41 (6) A school superintendent appointed by the governor who
42 serves as a voting member.
2025	IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 3
1 (7) One (1) individual who:
2 (A) is a licensed pediatrician; and
3 (B) specializes in childhood obesity;
4 appointed by the governor who serves as a voting member.
5 (b) A member appointed under subsection (a) serves for the
6 duration of the commission and serves at the will of the member's
7 appointing authority.
8 Sec. 5. (a) The governor shall designate a member of the
9 commission to serve as chairperson of the commission.
10 (b) A chairperson serves at the will of the governor.
11 Sec. 6. The commission meets at the call of the chairperson.
12 Sec. 7. Six (6) members of the commission constitute a quorum.
13 The affirmative vote of a majority of the voting members is
14 required to take any action.
15 Sec. 8. The state department shall staff the commission.
16 Sec. 9. (a) Each member of the commission who is not a state
17 employee is entitled to the minimum salary per diem provided by
18 IC 4-10-11-2.1(b). The member is also entitled to reimbursement
19 for mileage, traveling expenses as provided under IC 4-13-1-4, and
20 other expenses actually incurred in connection with the member's
21 duties as provided in the state policies and procedures established
22 by the Indiana department of administration and approved by the
23 budget agency.
24 (b) Each member of the commission who is a state employee is
25 entitled to reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
26 IC 4-13-1-4 and other expenses actually incurred in connection
27 with the member's duties as provided in the state policies and
28 procedures established by the Indiana department of
29 administration and approved by the budget agency.
30 (c) Each member of the commission who is a member of the
31 general assembly is entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage,
32 and travel allowances paid to members of the general assembly
33 serving on interim study committees established by the legislative
34 council. Per diem, mileage, and travel allowances paid under this
35 subsection shall be paid from appropriations made to the
36 legislative council or the legislative services agency.
37 (d) Expenses paid under subsections (a) and (b) shall be paid
38 from appropriations made to the state department.
39 Sec. 10. The commission shall submit an annual report to the
40 governor and the general assembly, in an electronic format under
41 IC 5-14-6, not later than June 30, 2026. The report must include
42 the commission's activities, findings, and recommendations for
2025	IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148 4
1 legislation.
2 Sec. 11. This chapter expires June 30, 2027.
2025	IN 132—LS 6511/DI 148