Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0144 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2025

                    *ES0144.1*
March 13, 2025
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 144
_____
DIGEST OF SB 144 (Updated March 11, 2025 1:57 pm - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 5-11.
Synopsis:  County police force pension trust and trust fund. Requires
in a county other than Marion County, that the county police
department or a designee of the county police department make an
annual presentation regarding the county police force pension trust and
trust fund to the county council.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Becker, Tomes, Niemeyer, Yoder,
Randolph Lonnie M, Dernulc
(HOUSE SPONSOR — MCNAMARA)
January 8, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
January 21, 2025, amended, reported favorably — Do Pass.
January 23, 2025, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 27, 2025, read third time, passed. Yeas 49, nays 0.
HOUSE ACTION
March 3, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public
Safety.
March 13, 2025, reported — Do Pass.
ES 144—LS 6469/DI 141  March 13, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
SENATE BILL No. 144
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
pensions.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 5-11-20-7 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2025]: Sec. 7. (a) This section applies only to a county police
4 force pension trust and trust fund authorized under IC 36-8.
5 (b) This section does not apply to a county having a consolidated
6 city.
7 (c) The county police department or the department's designee
8 shall make an annual presentation on the information contained in
9 a report under section 3 of this chapter for the county's
10 immediately preceding fiscal year to the county council.
11 (d) A presentation described in subsection (c) must occur not
12 later than two (2) months before the date of a public hearing on the
13 proposed budget of the county. 
ES 144—LS 6469/DI 141 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
which was referred Senate Bill No. 144, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill be AMENDED as follows:
Page 1, line 3, delete "A political subdivision offering an employee"
and insert "This section applies only to a county police force pension
trust and trust fund authorized under IC 36-8.
(b) This section does not apply to a county having a consolidated
city.
(c) The county police department or the department's designee
shall make an annual presentation on the information contained in
a report under section 3 of this chapter for the county's
immediately preceding fiscal year to the county council.".
Page 1, delete lines 4 through 9.
Page 1, line 10, delete "(b)" and insert "(d)".
Page 1, line 10, delete "(a)" and insert "(c)".
 Page 1, line 12, delete "in which the political subdivision is" and
insert ".".
Page 1, delete line 13.
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to SB 144 as introduced.)
BUCK, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0.
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public
Safety, to which was referred Senate Bill 144, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to SB 144 as printed January 22, 2025.) 
BARTELS
Committee Vote: Yeas 13, Nays 0         
ES 144—LS 6469/DI 141