Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0525 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                    *SB0525.1*
February 12, 2025
SENATE BILL No. 525
_____
DIGEST OF SB 525 (Updated February 11, 2025 10:39 am - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 36-2.
Synopsis:  Sheriff's appointment of deputies. Specifies the statutes
under which a county sheriff may appoint deputies.
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Carrasco, Freeman
January 16, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal
Law.
February 11, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass.
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87  February 12, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 525
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning local
government.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 36-2-16-4, AS AMENDED BY P.L.233-2015,
2 SECTION 337, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 4. Each of the following county
4 officers is entitled to appoint one (1) first or chief deputy, and also may
5 appoint the number of other full-time or part-time deputies and
6 employees authorized by the county fiscal body:
7 (1) The county auditor.
8 (2) The county treasurer.
9 (3) The county recorder.
10 (4) The county sheriff. Sheriff deputies may be appointed only
11 under IC 36-8.
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Corrections and Criminal
Law, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 525, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 525 as introduced.)
           
FREEMAN, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87