Indiana 2025 2025 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0525 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/18/2025

                    *SB0525.2*
Reprinted
February 19, 2025
SENATE BILL No. 525
_____
DIGEST OF SB 525 (Updated February 18, 2025 3:32 pm - DI 106)
Citations Affected:  IC 36-2.
Synopsis:  Marion County sheriff's deputies. Prohibits a Marion
County sheriff's deputy from attending the Indiana law enforcement
academy. Requires the law enforcement training board to certify one
law enforcement academy located in Marion County, to be used by the
Marion County sheriff's office and the Indianapolis metropolitan police
department. Provides that a Marion County sheriff's deputy may only
attend the law enforcement academy located in Marion County if the
deputy is subject to a merit board established by the governing body. 
Effective:  July 1, 2025.
Carrasco, Freeman,
Randolph Lonnie M
January 16, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal
Law.
February 11, 2025, reported favorably — Do Pass.
February 18, 2025, read second time, amended, ordered engrossed.
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87  Reprinted
February 19, 2025
First Regular Session of the 124th General Assembly (2025)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2024 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
SENATE BILL No. 525
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning local
government.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 36-2-16-4, AS AMENDED BY P.L.233-2015,
2 SECTION 337, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2025]: Sec. 4. (a) Each of the following county
4 officers is entitled to appoint one (1) first or chief deputy, and also may
5 appoint the number of other full-time or part-time deputies and
6 employees authorized by the county fiscal body:
7 (1) The county auditor.
8 (2) The county treasurer.
9 (3) The county recorder.
10 (4) The county sheriff.
11 (b) This subsection applies only to a county containing a
12 consolidated city. Notwithstanding IC 5-2-1-15 or any other
13 provision of law, a sheriff's deputy appointed by the sheriff of a
14 county containing a consolidated city may not:
15 (1) attend; or
16 (2) be accepted for training at;
17 the Indiana law enforcement academy.
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87 2
1 (c) The law enforcement training board created by IC 5-2-1-3
2 shall certify one (1) law enforcement academy, located in a county
3 containing a consolidated city, to be used by the Marion County
4 sheriff's office and the Indianapolis metropolitan police
5 department.
6 (d) A Marion County sheriff's deputy may only attend the law
7 enforcement academy described in subsection (c) if the deputy is
8 subject to a merit board established by the governing body of the
9 consolidated city.
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. President: The Senate Committee on Corrections and Criminal
Law, to which was referred Senate Bill No. 525, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to SB 525 as introduced.)
           
FREEMAN, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2
_____
SENATE MOTION
Mr. President: I move that Senate Bill 525 be amended to read as
follows:
Page 1, line 3, after "Sec. 4." insert "(a)".
Page 1, line 10, delete "Sheriff deputies may be appointed only".
Page 1, delete line 11, begin a new paragraph and insert:
"(b) This subsection applies only to a county containing a
consolidated city. Notwithstanding IC 5-2-1-15 or any other
provision of law, a sheriff's deputy appointed by the sheriff of a
county containing a consolidated city may not:
(1) attend; or
(2) be accepted for training at;
the Indiana law enforcement academy.
(c) The law enforcement training board created by IC 5-2-1-3
shall certify one (1) law enforcement academy, located in a county
containing a consolidated city, to be used by the Marion County
sheriff's office and the Indianapolis metropolitan police
department.
(d) A Marion County sheriff's deputy may only attend the law
enforcement academy described in subsection (c) if the deputy is
subject to a merit board established by the governing body of the
consolidated city.".
Renumber all SECTIONS consecutively.
(Reference is to SB 525 as printed February 12, 2025.)
FREEMAN
SB 525—LS 7101/DI 87