Kansas 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB229 Comm Sub / Bill

                    Session of 2023
House Substitute for SENATE BILL No. 229
By Committee on Legislative Modernization
3-13
AN ACT concerning the legislature; relating to compensation, salary and 
retirement benefits of members thereof; creating the legislative 
compensation commission; prescribing powers and duties of the 
commission; authorizing the commission to set rates of compensation 
and salary for members of the legislature; establishing procedures for 
review and possible rejection of such rates of compensation and salary 
by the legislature; eliminating the previously established compensation 
commission; repealing K.S.A. 46-3101.
Be it enacted by the Legislature of the State of Kansas:
Section 1. (a) There is created the legislative compensation 
commission consisting of nine members as follows:
(1) One member appointed by the speaker of the house of 
representatives. Such member appointed by the speaker shall be a former 
member of the legislature;
(2) one member appointed by the president of the senate. Such 
member appointed by the president shall be a former member of the 
legislature;
(3) one member appointed by the speaker pro tempore of the house of 
representatives;
(4) one member appointed by the vice president of the senate;
(5) one member appointed by the majority leader of the house of 
representatives;
(6) one member appointed by the majority leader of the senate;
(7) one member appointed by the minority leader of the house of 
representatives;
(8) one member appointed by the minority leader of the senate; and
(9) one member appointed by the governor.
(b) The initial member appointed by the speaker shall be appointed 
prior to August 1, 2023. All other initial members shall be appointed prior 
to September 1, 2023.
(c) No person shall be appointed to the commission who is a current 
member of the legislature, a current employee of the legislature or a 
registered lobbyist.
(d) The member appointed by the speaker shall serve as the first 
chairperson of the commission. The member appointed by the president 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36  Sub SB 229	2
shall serve as the first vice chairperson of the commission. Thereafter, the 
next chairperson to be appointed prior to August 1, 2026, shall be 
appointed by the president and the next vice chairperson to be appointed 
prior to September 1, 2026, shall be appointed by the speaker. The 
authority to appoint the chairperson and vice chairperson for future 
commissions shall alternate between the speaker and the president in 
similar manner as for the original appointments. Vacancies shall be filled 
in the same manner as for the original appointments.
(e) Any member of the commission shall be eligible for 
reappointment.
(f) The term of each appointment to the commission shall end upon 
the completion of the responsibilities of the commission pursuant to 
subsections (h) and (i).
(g) The commission shall meet upon call of the chairperson. A 
majority of the members of the commission shall constitute a quorum for 
the transaction of any business of the commission. Any action taken by the 
commission shall be by majority vote of the members present.
(h) The legislative compensation commission shall:
(1) Make a comprehensive study of the compensation, salary and 
retirement benefits of the members of the legislature;
(2) set the rates of compensation and salary for members of the 
legislature to be effective as provided in subsection (i); and
(3) make recommendations related to retirement benefits for members 
of the legislature.
(i) In 2023, the legislative compensation commission shall establish 
the rate of compensation and salary for services rendered by members of 
the legislature during the four-year period that commences on the first day 
of the term of office that commences on the first day of the legislative 
session in January of 2025. Such rate of compensation and salary 
established by the commission shall be submitted to the legislature on or 
before December 1, 2023. Such rate of compensation and salary 
established by the commission shall be the rate of compensation and salary 
for members of the legislature unless, prior to 30 days after the 
commencement of the legislative session next occurring after submission 
of such established rate of compensation and salary to the legislature, the 
legislature rejects such rate of compensation and salary by the adoption of 
a concurrent resolution. In the concurrent resolution that rejects such rate 
of compensation and salary, the legislature may include a requirement that 
the legislative compensation commission meet within 14 days after the 
adoption of the concurrent resolution by the legislature to set another rate 
of compensation and salary to be submitted to the legislature prior to 30 
days after such adoption of the concurrent resolution. The legislature may 
reject such rate of compensation and salary by the adoption of a concurrent 
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28
29
30
31
32
33
34
35
36
37
38
39
40
41
42
43  Sub SB 229	3
resolution prior to adjournment sine die of that legislative session. In the 
event of rejection by the legislature of the second rate of compensation and 
salary set by the commission, the rate of compensation and salary 
prevailing at the time of the previous session shall remain in effect.
(j) (1) New members of the commission shall be appointed in 2026 
and every four years thereafter. The member designated as chairperson of 
the commission pursuant to subsection (d) shall be appointed prior to 
August 1 of such year. All other members of the commission shall be 
appointed prior to September 1 of such year.
(2) Commissions appointed in 2026 and thereafter may meet on call 
of the chairperson during the calendar year when appointed or the 
following calendar year. The commission shall set the rate of 
compensation and salary for members of the legislature to be effective 
during the four-year period that commences on the first day of the next 
commencing term of office of elected senators. The commission shall 
submit such rate of compensation and salary to the legislature on or before 
December 1 of the calendar year following the commission's appointment.
(3) The legislature may take such actions as provided in subsection (i) 
during the legislative session next occurring after the submission of such 
rate of compensation and salary as provided in paragraph (2).
(k) Members of the commission shall receive compensation, 
subsistence allowances, mileage and expenses as provided in K.S.A. 75-
3223, and amendments thereto, when attending meetings of the 
commission.
Sec. 2. K.S.A. 46-3101 is hereby repealed.
Sec. 3. This act shall take effect and be in force from and after its 
publication in the Kansas register.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27