Kansas 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Kansas Senate Bill SB232 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    SESSION OF 2024
SUPPLEMENTAL NOTE ON HOUSE SUBSTITUTE FOR 
SUBSTITUTE FOR SENATE BILL NO. 232
As Amended by House Committee of the Whole
Brief*
House Sub. for Sub. for SB 232, as amended, would 
amend law in the Kansas Code for Care of Children (Code) 
governing orders granting custody for adoption when parental 
rights have been terminated. The bill would also amend law 
governing jurisdiction of proceedings under the Code to 
specify, if orders granting custody for adoption involve an 
Indian child, the federal Indian Child Welfare Act (ICWA) 
would apply instead of the Code.
The bill would be in effect upon publication in the 
Kansas Register.
Orders Granting Custody to Proposed Adoptive Parents
In an order granting custody to proposed adoptive 
parents, the bill would require the court to be guided by the 
best interests of the child. The bill would also specify, in this 
type of order, any prior custody order would cease upon the 
granting of custody of the child to the proposed adoptive 
parents.
Orders Granting Custody to Secretary or Corporation
In an order granting custody to the Secretary for 
Children and Families (Secretary) or to a corporation 
organized to care for and surrender children for adoption as 
____________________
*Supplemental notes are prepared by the Legislative Research 
Department and do not express legislative intent. The supplemental 
note and fiscal note for this bill may be accessed on the Internet at 
http://www.kslegislature.org specified by the Code, the bill would specify that the 
Secretary or corporation must be guided by the best interests 
of the child when making adoption decisions.
Adoption Selection Preference
The bill would further specify when a child is placed in 
the custody of the Secretary for the purposes of adoption 
when parental rights have been terminated or relinquished, 
the Secretary would be required to give preference, subject to 
the best interests of the child, in the following manner:
●If a child has been in the custody of the Secretary 
for less than one cumulative year:
○First to a relative;
○Second to a person with whom the child has 
close and healthy attachments.
●If a child has been in the custody of the Secretary 
for one cumulative year or more:
○To a placement that maintains the child’s 
close and healthy attachments.
The bill would require the Secretary to consider a foster 
parent as a prospective adoptive parent when:
●The child has lived more than half of the child’s 
lifetime with the foster parent;
●The child has lived more than two years with the 
foster parent; or
●The Secretary otherwise determines it is in the best 
interests of the child.
2- 232 Adoption Selection Policies, Training, and Data Collection
To implement the provisions of the bill, the Secretary 
would be required to:
●Develop and enforce adoption selection policies 
that comply with the bill and ensure caregiver and 
sibling attachments are appropriately considered;
●Review and update policies to reduce time to 
adoption permanency;
●Apply adoption selection policies consistently;
●Develop and provide training for contractors and 
employees;
●Collect data regarding best interest staffing 
conducted pursuant to the statute, including, but 
not limited to, data on the number of:
○Prospective adoptive parents who request the 
Secretary to reconsider an initial adoptive 
placement decision; and
○Initial adoptive placement decisions the 
Secretary overturns after reconsidering the 
initial adoptive placement decision.
Annual Report to the Legislature
The bill would require the Secretary to prepare a report 
on compliance with the provisions above, to be submitted to 
the Legislature on or before the first day of the 2025 
Legislative Session and each legislative session thereafter.
Background
The House Committee on Judiciary recommended a 
substitute bill containing the provisions of HB 2299, as further 
amended by the House Committee on Child Welfare and 
3- 232 Foster Care, pertaining to orders granting custody for 
adoption after parental rights have been terminated.
Sub. for SB 232, as passed by the Senate on February 
23, 2023, would have enacted the Child Advocate Act, 
establishing the Office of the Child Advocate as an 
independent state agency. 
[Note: The House Committee on Judiciary did not retain 
these provisions in its substitute bill. (On April 4, 2023, a 
Conference Committee on Senate Sub. for HB 2070 was 
appointed. As it entered conference, the bill contained similar 
provisions concerning the Office of the Child Advocate).]
The House Committee of the Whole amended the 
substitute bill to:
●Remove the ability of a foster parent to appeal a 
placement decision and remove a related 
requirement of the Secretary to report data on 
such appeals to the Legislature;
●Change the required submission date of the 
Secretary’s report to the Legislature; and
●Remove a provision requiring retroactive 
application of the bill.
HB 2299 – Orders Granting Custody For Adoption
HB 2299 was introduced by the House Committee on 
Child Welfare and Foster Care at the request of 
Representative Humphries.
House Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care 
In the House Committee hearing on February 8, 2023, 
representatives of the Children’s Alliance of Kansas and 
FosterAdopt Connect testified as proponents of the bill. The 
proponents generally stated the issue of considering 
4- 232 attachment to caregivers in cases of adoption from the foster 
care system has developed over the last few years and 
believe this bill effectively balances the various 
considerations related to the topic. Written-only proponent 
testimony was provided by the Child Advocate and a 
representative of KVC Kansas.
No other testimony was provided.
The House Committee adopted amendments to:
●Change the bill’s effective date;
●Make the bill’s provisions retroactive to pending 
proceedings on the effective date of the bill;
●Further clarify how the Secretary shall give 
preference to adoptive placements;
●Further clarify what data the Secretary must collect 
under the bill’s provisions; and
●Clarify ICWA would apply in orders granting 
custody involving an Indian child.
On February 23, 2023, the bill was withdrawn from the 
House Calendar and referred to the House Committee on 
Appropriations (HAPP). On March 1, 2023, the bill was 
withdrawn from HAPP and rereferred to the House 
Committee on Child Welfare and Foster Care.
On March 15, 2023, the House Committee further 
amended the bill to clarify language concerning the right of a 
foster parent to request direct placement of a child when 
certain criteria are met.
Fiscal Information
According to the fiscal note prepared by the Division of 
the Budget on HB 2299, as introduced, the Office of Judicial 
Administration indicates that enactment of the bill would have 
5- 232 a fiscal effect on expenditures of the Judicial Branch. 
However, until the courts have had an opportunity to operate 
under the bill’s provisions, an accurate estimate of the fiscal 
effect on expenditures by the Judicial Branch cannot be 
given. Enactment of the bill would not have a fiscal effect on 
revenues to the Judicial Branch but could result in the 
collection of docket fees in those cases filed under the 
provisions of the bill, which would be deposited in the State 
General Fund.
The Department for Children and Families indicates 
enactment of the bill would have a negligible fiscal effect on 
the agency. Any fiscal effect associated with the bill is not 
reflected in The FY 2024 Governor’s Budget Report.
Revised Kansas Code for Care of Children; jurisdiction; custody; adoption; 
attachment; foster parent; best interest of the child; Secretary for Children and 
Families
6- 232