UNOFFICIAL COPY 23 RS BR 910 Page 1 of 1 XXXX 1/1/2023 7:55 PM Jacketed AN ACT relating to deficient administrative regulations and declaring an 1 emergency. 2 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the Commonwealth of Kentucky: 3 SECTION 1. A NEW SECTION OF KRS CHAPTER 13A IS CREATED TO 4 READ AS FOLLOWS: 5 (1) The General Assembly finds that 803 KAR 1:006, Employer-Employee 6 Relationship, was found deficient but became effective notwithstanding the 7 finding of deficiency pursuant to KRS 13A.330, on or after April 14, 2022, and 8 before March 30, 2023, as evidenced by records of the Legislative Research 9 Commission. 10 (2) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes 11 notwithstanding, the administrative regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this 12 section, including any subsequently filed amendment, shall be null, void, and 13 unenforceable as of the effective date of this Act. 14 (3) Contrary provisions of any section of the Kentucky Revised Statutes 15 notwithstanding, the administrative body shall be prohibited from promulgating 16 an administrative regulation that is identical to, or substantially the same as, the 17 administrative regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this section for a period 18 beginning on January 3, 2023, and concluding on June 1, 2024. 19 (4) The administrative regulation referenced in subsection (1) of this section shall be 20 available to the public, in the office of the Legislative Research Commission's 21 regulations compiler. 22 Section 2. Whereas it is crucial that the Commonwealth's regulatory policy 23 reflect the statutory intent of the General Assembly, an emergency is declared to exist, 24 and this Act takes effect upon its passage and approval by the Governor or upon its 25 otherwise becoming a law. 26