UNOFFICIAL COPY 24 RS BR 2504 Page 1 of 2 XXXX 3/27/2024 11:33 AM Jacketed A RESOLUTION recognizing April 2, 2024, as World Autism Awareness Day and 1 April 2024 as Autism Acceptance Month. 2 WHEREAS, autism disorders affect persons regardless of race, religion, 3 socioeconomic status, or geography; and 4 WHEREAS, autism is the fastest-growing developmental disorder in the United 5 States, with one in 36 children being diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder; and 6 WHEREAS, there are over five million people in the United States with autism and, 7 as of 2019, over 80,000 Kentuckians diagnosed with autism; and 8 WHEREAS, autism disorders are lifelong conditions that require support, training, 9 assistance, and advocacy on behalf of those individuals who suffer from such disorders; 10 and 11 WHEREAS, on December 18, 2007, the United Nations General Assembly adopted 12 a resolution declaring World Autism Awareness Day by unanimous consent; and 13 WHEREAS, the Autism Society of Kentucky understands the importance of 14 fostering acceptance in order to achieve equity in education, employment, housing, health 15 care, and comprehensive long-term services and supports; and 16 WHEREAS, the Autism Society of Kentucky provides education and understanding 17 to promote acceptance, inspire inclusion, and create systems-wide change for individuals 18 with autism so they may achieve full participation within society; and 19 WHEREAS, policies need to be implemented that break down barriers for 20 individuals with autism so they may succeed in their chosen communities; and 21 WHEREAS, the aims for World Autism Awareness Day are to inform the general 22 public about the global health crisis of autism disorders, stress the importance of early 23 diagnosis and early intervention, and celebrate the unique talents and qualities of 24 individuals with autism disorders; and 25 WHEREAS, April is recognized as Autism Acceptance Month to increase 26 awareness about autism signs and symptoms and promote acceptance of individuals with 27 UNOFFICIAL COPY 24 RS BR 2504 Page 2 of 2 XXXX 3/27/2024 11:33 AM Jacketed autism; and 1 WHEREAS, during April 2024, the aim of Autism Acceptance Month is to 2 celebrate differences and build an inclusive society for individuals with autism to live 3 fully through connection and acceptance; 4 NOW, THEREFORE, 5 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives of the General Assembly of the 6 Commonwealth of Kentucky: 7 Section 1. The members of the House of Representatives, both individually and 8 collectively, hereby recognize April 2, 2024, as World Autism Awareness Day and April 9 2024 as Autism Acceptance Month. 10 Section 2. The House of Repres entatives urges the citizens of the 11 Commonwealth of Kentucky to become informed of the need for services, support, and 12 treatments for individuals with autism disorders. 13 Section 3. The Clerk of the House of Representatives is directed to transmit a 14 copy of this Resolution to Representative Tina Bojanowski. 15