HLS 10RS-473 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 Regular Session, 2010 HOUSE BILL NO. 362 BY REPRESENTATIVE EDWARDS APPROPRIATIONS/JUDGMENT: Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the State of La. in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford, et al. v. Diamond B. Construction, et al." AN ACT1 To appropriate funds out of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2010-2 2011 to be used to pay the judgment in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford and Lisa3 Crawford v. Diamond B. Construction, L.L.C., D/B/A Diamond B. Construction4 Company, Inc., State of Louisiana, through the Department of Transportation and5 Development and St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company"; to provide for6 interest; to provide for court costs; and to provide for related matters.7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8 Section 1. The sum of Four Hundred Twenty-Three Thousand Six Hundred and9 No/100 ($423,600.00) Dollars, plus legal interest from February 9, 2001, until paid; plus10 court costs in the amount of Thirty-One Thousand Nine Hundred Three and 39/10011 ($31,903.39) Dollars, plus legal interest from September 22, 2008, until paid; plus appeal12 costs in the amount of Seven Thousand Two Hundred Sixteen and 28/100 ($7,216.28)13 Dollars, plus legal interest from September 11, 2009, until paid, is hereby appropriated out14 of the General Fund of the state of Louisiana for Fiscal Year 2010-2011 to be used to pay15 the judgment in the suit entitled "Ricky Crawford and Lisa Crawford v. Diamond B.16 Construction, L.L.C., D/B/A Diamond B. Construction Company, Inc., State of Louisiana,17 through the Department of Transportation and Development and St. Paul Fire and Marine18 Insurance Company", bearing Number 2001–000480, Division "C" on the docket of the19 HLS 10RS-473 ORIGINAL HB NO. 362 Page 2 of 2 Twenty-First Judicial District Court, parish of Tangipahoa, state of Louisiana; and bearing1 No. 2009 CA 0226 on the docket of the First Circuit Court of Appeal, state of Louisiana.2 Section 2. The judgment provided for in Section 1 hereof shall be deemed to have3 been paid on the effective date of this Act and legal interest shall cease to run as of that date.4 Section 3. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2010; if vetoed by the governor5 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,6 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later. 7 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Edwards HB No. 362 Appropriates from the state general fund for FY 2010-2011 the sum of $423,600, plus legal interest from Feb. 9, 2001; plus court costs in the amount of $31,903.39, plus legal interest from Sept. 22, 2008; plus appeal costs in the amount of $7,216.28, plus legal interest from Sept. 11, 2009; to pay the judgment in "Ricky Crawford and Lisa Crawford v. Diamond B. Construction, et al.", bearing No. 2001–000480, Div."C" on the docket of the 21 st JDC, parish of Tangipahoa, state of La., and No. 2009 CA 0226 on the docket of the 1 st Circuit Court of Appeal, state of La. Effective July 1, 2010.