Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB373 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 10RS-1223	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE BILL NO. 373
BY REPRESENTATIVE HUTTER
SUNSET LAW:  Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Devleopment
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(5)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(a), relative to the Department of2
Transportation and Development; to provide for the re-creation of the Department3
of Transportation and Development and the statutory entities made a part of the4
department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory5
authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related6
matters.7
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Transportation and9
Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-10
created effective June 30, 2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in11
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised12
Statutes of 1950.13
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of14
Transportation and Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department as15
re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease July 1, 2015, pursuant to R.S. 49:191.16
However, the Department of Transportation and Development may be re-created prior to17
such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the18
Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.19
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that20
those provisions are in conflict with provisions of this Act.21
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(5)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:22 HLS 10RS-1223	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 373
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-1
out period for statutory entities; table of dates2
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the3
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their4
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority5
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of6
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:7
*          *          *8
(5)  July 1, 2014:9
*          *          *10
(b) The Department of Transportation and Development and all statutory11
entities made a part of the department by law.12
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(3)(a) is hereby repealed in its entirety.13
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010, if vetoed by the14
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on15
June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.16
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Hutter	HB No. 373
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Development.
Present law (sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all
statutory entities made a part of the department shall begin to terminate their operations on
July 1, 2010, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2011,
unless the legislature enacts a bill re-creating them prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and
Development and its statutory entities. Provides that July 1, 2015, is the new termination
date, and termination would begin July 1, 2014, unless such entities are again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2010.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(5)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(3)(a))