HLS 10RS-1223 ENGROSSED Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2010 HOUSE BILL NO. 373 BY REPRESENTATIVE HUTTER SUNSET LAW: Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Devleopment AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 49:191(5)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(a), relative to the Department of2 Transportation and Development; to provide for the re-creation of the Department3 of Transportation and Development and the statutory entities made a part of the4 department by law; to provide for the effective termination date for all statutory5 authority for the existence of such statutory entities; and to provide for related6 matters.7 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:8 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Transportation and9 Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-10 created effective June 30, 2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in11 accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised12 Statutes of 1950.13 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of14 Transportation and Development and the statutory entities made a part of the department as15 re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease July 1, 2015, pursuant to R.S. 49:191.16 However, the Department of Transportation and Development may be re-created prior to17 such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the18 Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.19 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that20 those provisions are in conflict with provisions of this Act.21 HLS 10RS-1223 ENGROSSED HB NO. 373 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Section 4. R.S. 49:191(5)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:1 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-2 out period for statutory entities; table of dates3 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the4 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their5 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority6 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of7 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:8 * * *9 (5) July 1, 2014:10 * * *11 (b) The Department of Transportation and Development and all statutory12 entities made a part of the department by law.13 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(3)(a) is hereby repealed in its entirety.14 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010, if vetoed by the15 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on16 June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.17 DIGEST The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent. [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)] Hutter HB No. 373 Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Transportation and Development. Present law (sunset law) provides that the Dept. of Transportation and Development and all statutory entities made a part of the department shall begin to terminate their operations on July 1, 2010, and that all legislative authority for such entities shall cease as of July 1, 2011, unless the legislature enacts a bill re-creating them prior thereto. Proposed law provides for the general re-creation of the Dept. of Transportation and Development and its statutory entities. Provides that July 1, 2015, is the new termination date, and termination would begin July 1, 2014, unless such entities are again re-created. Effective June 30, 2010. (Adds R.S. 49:191(5)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(3)(a))