Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB382 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 10RS-1333	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE BILL NO. 382
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
FIRE PROTECT/FIRE MARSHAL:  Provides relative to emergency elevator access
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 40:1582(B), relative to emergency elevator access; to require a2
new elevator installed in a building with five or less stories to operate with the fire3
emergency master key; and to provide for related matters.4
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5
Section 1.  R.S. 40:1582(B) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 6
ยง1582. Emergency elevator access; master key; substitute emergency measures;7
enforcement; penalty; rulemaking authority8
*          *          *9
B. Each existing building in this state which is six or more stories in height10
shall comply with Subsection A of this Section before January 1, 2012.  Each11
building in this state which is five or less stories in height in which a new elevator12
is installed after January 1, 2013, shall comply with Subsection A of this Section.13
*          *          *14
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
St. Germain	HB No. 382
Abstract: Requires a new elevator installed after Jan. 1, 2013, in a building with five or less
stories to operate with the fire emergency master key. HLS 10RS-1333	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 382
Page 2 of 2
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Present law requires all buildings which are six or more stories in height and constructed or
substantially renovated after Jan. 1, 2009, to have all of the keys for elevators that allow
public access keyed so as to allow all elevators to operate in fire emergency situations with
a single master elevator key.
Present law requires all existing buildings which are six or more stories in height to comply
with present law before Jan. 1, 2012.
Proposed law requires all buildings which are five or less stories in height in which a new
elevator is installed after Jan. 1, 2013, to comply with 	present law. 
(Amends R.S. 40:1582(B))