ENROLLED Page 1 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2010 HOUSE BILL NO. 515 BY REPRESENTATIVE PEARSON AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 11:108(B)(3), (C), and (F), relative to the Firefighters'2 Retirement System, the Municipal Employees' Retirement System, and the3 Municipal Police Employees ' Retirement System, provides for the organization,4 governance, administration, and membership of the Funding Review Panel charged5 with studying the funding and benefit provisions of such systems; to provide with6 respect to election of a chairman for such panel; to provide for reporting7 requirements; to provide an effective date; and to provide for related matters.8 Notice of intention to introduce this Act has been published9 as provided by Article X, Section 29(C) of the Constitution10 of Louisiana.11 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:12 Section 1. R.S. 11:108(B)(3), (C), and (F) are hereby amended and reenacted to read13 as follows:14 ยง108. Funding Review Panel15 * * *16 B.17 * * *18 (3)(a)The panel shall elect from the members of the recommendations19 committee a chairman and vice chairman of the panel. If the state treasurer is elected20 chairman or vice chairman, his designee shall serve in such office at any meeting of21 the panel at which he represents the treasurer. 22 (b) At the first meeting in Fiscal Year 2010-2011, and at the first meeting in23 each fiscal year thereafter, the panel shall elect from the members of the24 recommendations committee a chairman and vice chairman of the panel. If the state25 ENROLLEDHB NO. 515 Page 2 of 2 CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored are additions. treasurer is elected chairman or vice chairman, his designee shall serve in such office1 at any meeting of the panel at which he represents the treasurer.2 * * *3 C. (1) The panel shall meet not less than monthly. The treasurer shall call the4 first meeting of the panel on or before August 31, 2005, and shall preside until the5 panel elects a chairman and vice chairman.6 (2) The treasurer shall call the first meeting for Fiscal Year 2010-2011 on or7 before August 31, 2010. The treasurer or his designee shall preside until the panel8 elects a chairman and vice chairman.9 * * *10 F.(1) On or before February 15, 2006, the panel shall submit to the House11 and Senate Committees committees on Retirement retirement and to the legislative12 actuary a report containing its recommendations for increasing the actuarial13 soundness of each system and providing a generous, affordable benefit for members14 of each system.15 (2) On or before March 15, 2011, the panel shall submit to the House and16 Senate committees on retirement and to the legislative auditor a report containing its17 recommendations for increasing the actuarial soundness of each system and for18 providing an affordable benefit for members of each system.19 Section 2. This Act shall become effective on July 1, 2010; if vetoed by the governor20 and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on July 1,21 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.22 SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATI VES PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA APPROVED: