Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB597 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 10RS-1135	REENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE BILL NO. 597
BY REPRESENTATIVE ST. GERMAIN
FISHING/COMMERCIAL: Allows commercial fishing for shad throughout the
Atchafalaya Basin Spillway
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 56:322.2(A) and (D)(2), to enact R.S. 56:322.2(C)(3), and to2
repeal R.S. 56:322.2(G) and (I), relative to commercial take of shad and skipjack; to3
authorize nighttime taking of shad and skipjack in Iberville Parish and the4
Atchafalaya Basin; and to provide for related matters.5
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6
Section 1. R.S. 56:322.2(A) and (D)(2) are hereby amended and reenacted and R.S.7
56:322.2(C)(3) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 8
ยง322.2.  Shad gill nets; commercial harvest of shad and skipjack herring9
A.  A commercial fisherman licensed in accordance with R.S. 56:303 and10
305(B)(4)(f) may take shad and skipjack with a shad gill net in accordance with this11
Section Lake Palourde, Lake Verret, Lac Des Allemands, all of the waterways in12
Iberville Parish, and those portions of the parishes of Iberia, St. Martin, and St. Mary13
located between the guide levees of the Atchafalaya Basin but is specifically not14
authorized to do so in the streams, bayous, canals, and other water bodies connected15
with the specified lakes.16
*          *          *17
C. 18
*          *          *19 HLS 10RS-1135	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 597
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
(3)  Each shad gill net shall be placed at least fifty feet from the tree1
line.2
D.3
*          *          *4
(2)  In Lake Palourde and Lake Verret, shad  Shad and skipjack may be taken5
after sunset and before sunrise during open season.  In addition, in Pat's Bay in6
Iberville Parish from November 1, 2008, through June 31, 2010, shad and skipjack7
may be taken after sunset and before sunrise during the open season.8
*          *          *9
Section 2.  R.S. 56:322.2(G) and (I) are hereby repealed in their entirety.10
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
St. Germain	HB No. 597
Abstract: Allows nighttime commercial fishing of shad and skipjack in the Atchafalaya
Basin.
Present law allows the nighttime commercial take of shad and skipjack in Lake Verret, Lake
Palourde, and from Nov. 1, 2008, to June 30, 2010, in Pat's Bay in Iberville Parish.
Proposed law allows the nighttime commercial take of shad and skipjack in Lake Verret,
Lake Palourde, Lac Des Allemands, throughout Iberville Parish, and in those portions of the
parishes of Iberia, St. Martin, and St. Mary located between the guide levees of the
Atchafalaya Basin.
Proposed law requires shad gill nets to be placed at least 50 feet from the tree line.
Present law had authorized  in Lake Palourde and Lake Verret, certain people to leave two
shad gill nets unattended overnight.  Present law was effective until March 31, 2007, at
which point such authorization no longer existed.  Proposed law repeals the out-dated
provision.
(Amends R.S. 56:322.2(A) and (D)(2); Adds R.S. 56:322.2(C)(3); Repeals R.S.56:322.2(G)
and (I))
Summary of Amendments Adopted by House
Committee Amendments Proposed by 	House Committee on Natural Resources and
Environment to the original bill.
1. Made the laws regulating shad gill netting applicable across all the water bodies
where such commercial fishing is allowed. HLS 10RS-1135	REENGROSSED
HB NO. 597
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
2. Required shad gill nets to be placed at least 50 feet from the tree line.