Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB615 Engrossed / Bill

                    HLS 10RS-1320	ENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
HOUSE BILL NO. 615
BY REPRESENTATIVE KATZ
SUNSET LAW:  Provides for the re-creation of the Dept. of Social Services
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(5)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(j), relative to the Department of2
Social Services; to provide for re-creation of the Department of Social Services and3
the statutory entities made a part of the department by law; to provide for the4
effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence of such5
statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Department of Social Services and the8
statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,9
2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of10
Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.11
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Department of Social12
Services and the statutory entities made part of the department as re-created by Section 1 of13
this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2015, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Department14
of Social Services may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the provisions of15
Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.16
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that17
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.18 HLS 10RS-1320	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 615
Page 2 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(5)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows: 1
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities; phase-2
out period for statutory entities; table of dates3
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the4
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their5
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority6
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of7
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:8
*          *          *9
(5)  July 1, 2014:10
*          *          *11
(b) The Department of Social Services and all statutory entities made a part12
of the department by law.13
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(3)(j) is hereby repealed in its entirety.14
Section 6.  This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010; if vetoed by the15
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on16
June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.17
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Katz	HB No. 615
Abstract: Re-creates the Dept. of Social Services.
Present law requires under provisions of the "sunset" law that DSS and all statutory entities
made a part of DSS by law shall begin to terminate operations on July 1, 2010.
Present law provides that all legislative authority for DSS shall cease as of July 1, 2011,
unless legislation is enacted which authorizes the re-creation of the agency and its statutory
entities prior thereto.
Proposed law provides for the re-creation of DSS and its statutory entities, effective June 30,
2010, in accordance with the "sunset" law. Supersedes the provisions of the "sunset" law
which set out the procedure for review and re-creation and which require a separate bill to
re-create each statutory entity within DSS along with additional provisions. HLS 10RS-1320	ENGROSSED
HB NO. 615
Page 3 of 3
CODING: Words in struck through type are deletions from existing law; words underscored
are additions.
Proposed law sets July 1, 2015, as the new termination date of DSS, with termination to
begin July 1, 2014, unless the agency is again re-created.
Effective June 30, 2010.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(5)(b); Repeals R.S. 49:191(3)(j))