SLS 10RS-173 ORIGINAL Page 1 of 2 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2010 SENATE BILL NO. 105 BY SENATOR RISER WORKFORCE COMMISSION. Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission. (6/30/2010) AN ACT1 To enact R.S. 49:191(5)and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(g), relative to the Louisiana Workforce2 Commission; to provide for the re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce Commission3 and the statutory entities made a part of the commission by law; to provide for the4 effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence of such5 statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7 Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Workforce Commission8 and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created9 effective June 30, 2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in10 accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana11 Revised Statutes of 1950.12 Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana13 Workforce Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the department as14 re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2016, pursuant to R.S.15 49:191. However, the Louisiana Workforce Commission may be re-created prior to16 such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of17 SB NO. 105 SLS 10RS-173 ORIGINAL Page 2 of 2 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.1 Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent2 that those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.3 Section 4. R.S. 49:191(5) is hereby enacted to read as follows:4 ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;5 phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates6 Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the7 legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their8 operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority9 for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of10 July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:11 * * *12 (5) July 1, 2014:13 (a) The Louisiana Workforce Commission and all statutory entities14 made a part of the department by law.15 Section 5. R.S. 49:191(3)(g) is hereby repealed.16 Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010; if vetoed by the17 governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become18 effective on June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature,19 whichever is later.20 The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Mary Dozier O'Brien. DIGEST Present law provides for the Louisiana Workforce Commission (LWC) to begin to terminate operations on July 1, 2010, and to cease existence on July 1, 2011. Proposed law re-creates the LWC and extends its operation to July 1, 2014, at which time operations should be terminated. Proposed law extends the existence of LWC until July 1, 2015. Effective June 30, 2010. (Adds R.S. 49:191(5) and repeals 49:191(3)(g))