Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB105 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 10RS-173	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
SENATE BILL NO. 105
BY SENATOR RISER 
WORKFORCE COMMISSION. Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission.
(6/30/2010)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(5)and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(g), relative to the Louisiana Workforce2
Commission; to provide for the re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce Commission3
and the statutory entities made a part of the commission by law; to provide for the4
effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence of such5
statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1. Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Workforce Commission8
and the statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created9
effective June 30, 2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in10
accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana11
Revised Statutes of 1950.12
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana13
Workforce Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the department as14
re-created by Section 1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2016, pursuant to R.S.15
49:191. However, the Louisiana Workforce Commission may be re-created prior to16
such date in accordance with the provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of17 SB NO. 105
SLS 10RS-173	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.1
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent2
that those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.3
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(5) is hereby enacted to read as follows:4
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;5
phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates6
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the7
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their8
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority9
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of10
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:11
*          *          *12
(5)  July 1, 2014:13
(a) The Louisiana Workforce Commission and all statutory entities14
made a part of the department by law.15
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(3)(g) is hereby repealed.16
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010; if vetoed by the17
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become18
effective on June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature,19
whichever is later.20
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Mary Dozier O'Brien.
DIGEST
Present law provides for the Louisiana Workforce Commission (LWC) to begin to terminate
operations on July 1, 2010, and to cease existence on July 1, 2011.
Proposed law re-creates the LWC and extends its operation to July 1, 2014, at which time
operations should be terminated.
Proposed law extends the existence of LWC until July 1, 2015.
Effective June 30, 2010.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(5) and repeals 49:191(3)(g))