Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB105 Engrossed / Bill

                    SLS 10RS-173	REENGROSSED
Page 1 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
SENATE BILL NO. 105
BY SENATOR RISER 
WORKFORCE COMMISSION. Re-creates the Louisiana Workforce Commission.
(6/30/10)
AN ACT1
To enact R.S. 49:191(5)(b) and to repeal R.S. 49:191(3)(g), relative to the Louisiana2
Workforce Commission; to provide for the re-creation of the Louisiana Workforce3
Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the commission by law; to4
provide for the effective termination date for all statutory authority for the existence5
of such statutory entities; and to provide for related matters.6
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:7
Section 1.  Pursuant to R.S. 49:193, the Louisiana Workforce Commission and the8
statutory entities made a part of the department by law shall be re-created effective June 30,9
2010, and all statutory authority therefor is continued in accordance with the provisions of10
Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.11
Section 2. All statutory authority for the existence of the Louisiana Workforce12
Commission and the statutory entities made a part of the department as re-created by Section13
1 of this Act shall cease as of July 1, 2016, pursuant to R.S. 49:191. However, the Louisiana14
Workforce Commission may be re-created prior to such date in accordance with the15
provisions of Part XII of Chapter 1 of Title 49 of the Louisiana Revised Statutes of 1950.16
Section 3. The provisions of R.S. 49:193 are hereby superseded to the extent that17 SB NO. 105
SLS 10RS-173	REENGROSSED
Page 2 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
those provisions are in conflict with the provisions of this Act.1
Section 4.  R.S. 49:191(5)(b) is hereby enacted to read as follows:2
ยง191. Termination of legislative authority for existence of statutory entities;3
phase-out period for statutory entities; table of dates4
Notwithstanding any termination dates set by any previous Act of the5
legislature, the statutory entities set forth in this Section shall begin to terminate their6
operations on July first of each of the following years, and all legislative authority7
for the existence of any statutory entity, as defined in R.S. 49:190, shall cease as of8
July first of the following year, which shall be the termination date:9
*          *          *10
(5)  July 1, 2014:11
*          *          *12
(b) The Louisiana Workforce Commission and all statutory entities13
made a part of the department by law.14
Section 5.  R.S. 49:191(3)(g) is hereby repealed.15
Section 6. This Act shall become effective on June 30, 2010; if vetoed by the16
governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become effective on17
June 30, 2010, or on the day following such approval by the legislature, whichever is later.18
The original instrument was prepared by Mary Dozier O'Brien. The
following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative
instrument, was prepared by Cathy Wells.
DIGEST
Riser (SB 105)
Present law provides for the Louisiana Workforce Commission (LWC) to begin to terminate
operations on July 1, 2010, and to cease existence on July 1, 2011.
Proposed law re-creates the LWC and extends its operation to July 1, 2014, at which time
operations should be terminated.
Proposed law extends the existence of LWC until July 1, 2015.
Effective June 30, 2010.
(Adds R.S. 49:191(5)(b); repeals 49:191(3)(g)) SB NO. 105
SLS 10RS-173	REENGROSSED
Page 3 of 3
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate
Senate Floor Amendments to engrossed bill.
1. Corrects citation.