Louisiana 2010 2010 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB394 Introduced / Bill

                    SLS 10RS-976	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
Regular Session, 2010
SENATE BILL NO. 394
BY SENATOR DONAHUE 
STREAMLINING GOVERNMENT. Provides relative to the Commission on Streamlining
Government. (8/15/10)
AN ACT1
To amend and reenact R.S. 24:101(A), 102(2), 103(D)(1), (2), (3), (4), (5), and (6) and (F),2
104(B) and 109 and to repeal R.S. 24:104(C), relative to the Commission on3
Streamlining Government; to delete certain outdated provisions; to make technical4
revisions; and to provide for related matters.5
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6
Section 1. R.S. 24:101(A), 102(2), 103(D)(1), (2), (3), (4), (5), and (6) and (F),7
104(B) and 109 are hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 8
§101. Purpose and findings9
A. The state of Louisiana faces a severe decline in revenues through fiscal10
year 2012 which, if no corrective action is taken, will leave a significant funding gap11
in state government expenditures and will create serious sustainability issues in12
financing of state obligations.13
*          *          *14
§102. Definitions15
As used in this Part, the following terms shall have the following meanings,16
unless the context requires otherwise:17 SB NO. 394
SLS 10RS-976	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
*          *          *1
(2) "Agency" means and includes any office, department, board, commission,2
institution, division, office, instrumentality, or functional group, heretofore existing3
or hereafter created, that is authorized to exercise, or that does exercise, any4
functions in the executive branch of state government. "Agency" shall not 	mean5
include any public institution of postsecondary education, any postsecondary6
education governing or management board, or any entity under the control of a7
public institution of postsecondary education or postsecondary education governing8
or management board.9
*          *          *10
§103. Commission on Streamlining Government; established11
*          *          *12
D. The commission shall be composed as follows:13
(1) The commissioner of administration, or the commissioner's her designee.14
(2) The speaker of the House of Representatives, or the speaker's his15
designee.16
(3) The president of the Senate, or the president's his designee.17
(4) The state treasurer, or the treasurer's his designee.18
(5) The chairman of the House Committee on Appropriations, or the19
chairman's his designee.20
(6) The chairman of the Senate Committee on Finance, or the chairman's  his21
designee.22
*          *          *23
F.(1) The names of the persons who are to serve on the commission shall be24
submitted to the president of the Senate on or before July 15, 2009.25
(2) The president of the Senate shall call the first meeting of the commission26
which shall be held on or before July 30, 2009.27
(3) At the first meeting, the members of the commission shall elect from their28
membership a chairman and vice chairman and such other officers as the commission29 SB NO. 394
SLS 10RS-976	ORIGINAL
Page 3 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
may deem advisable. The president of the Senate or his designee  chairman shall1
preside over the commission until a successor chairman is elected by the2
commission.3
§104. Procedure4
*          *          *5
B.(1) The commission shall submit an initial report of its recommendations,6
including recommendations requiring legislation or administrative action, to the7
governor, the president of the Senate, the speaker of the House of Representatives,8
the Senate and Governmental Affairs Committee, the House and Governmental9
Affairs Committee, and the commissioner of administration no later than December10
15, 2009.11
(2) The commission shall prepare the recommendations in the report as a12
reorganization plan and submit the plan to the Senate and Governmental Affairs13
Committee and the House and Governmental Affairs Committee for consideration14
by January 4, 2010 and the committees, meeting as a joint committee, shall review15
the plan by February 1, 2010.16
(3) Executive and legislative action as may be necessary to implement the17
reorganization plan as approved or modified by the two committees meeting jointly18
shall be taken as soon as possible.19
C. The commission shall submit a report annually before January first20
consisting of the status and implementation of the reorganization plan approved by21
the Senate and Governmental Affairs Committee and the House and Governmental22
Affairs Committee to the governor, the president of the Senate, the speaker of the23
House of Representatives, the Senate and Governmental Affairs Committee, the24
House and Governmental Affairs Committee, and the commissioner of25
administration.26
(2) Executive and legislative action as may be necessary to implement the27
reorganization plan recommendations in the annual report, as approved or28
modified by the two committees meeting jointly, shall be taken as soon as29 SB NO. 394
SLS 10RS-976	ORIGINAL
Page 4 of 4
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.
possible.1
*          *          *2
§109. Termination of Part3
This Part shall become null and of no effect and the commission shall4
terminate on January 12, 2012.5
Section 2. R.S. 24:104(C) is hereby repealed in its entirety.6
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot.
DIGEST
Present law establishes and provides relative to the Commission on Streamlining
Government.
Proposed law deletes certain provisions no longer applicable and makes technical changes,
otherwise retains present law.
Effective August 15, 2010.
(Amends R.S. 24:101(A), 102(2), 103(D)(1), (2), (3), (4), (5), and (6) and (F), 104(B) and
109; repeals R.S. 24:104(C))