Louisiana 2011 2011 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HB459 Introduced / Bill

                    HLS 11RS-507	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 3
Regular Session, 2011
HOUSE BILL NO. 459
BY REPRESENTATIVE ABRAMSON
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
PUBLIC LANDS/STATE:  Provides for the exchange of property in Orleans Parish
AN ACT1
To authorize and provide for the transfer, sale, exchange, or lease of certain state real2
property in Orleans Parish between the division of administration and the Deutsches3
Haus; and to provide for related matters.4
Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:5
Section 1. The commissioner of the division of administration on behalf of the state6
of Louisiana, notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, is hereby7
authorized and empowered to convey, sell, transfer, or assign and deliver to any and all8
interest, excluding mineral rights, the state may have to the following described property to9
the Deutsches Haus:10
Situated in the Third District of the City of New Orleans on the right bank of Bayou11
St. John; six (6) lots of ground acquired in two different transactions (plan by de12
L'lisle referenced), containing +/- 4.64 acres, according to records on file in this13
office.14
Act passed before Joseph Dewey Taylor June 29, 1883 (transaction 1).15
Lot One (1) measures about one hundred and twenty-five feet front on Bayou16
St. John one hundred and nineteen feet in the rear, about three hundred and ninety17
feet on the side dividing it from Lot Two (2) and about three hundred and seventy18
feet on the other side.19
Lot Two (2) measures about one hundred and twenty-nine feet front on said20
Bayou St. John, one hundred and twenty-six wide in the rear, about three hundred21
and ninety feet deep on the line of division from Lot One (1), and about three22
hundred and sixty feet on the line of division from Lot Three (3).23
Lot Three (3) measures about one hundred and fifteen feet front on said24
Bayou St. John, about one hundred and five feet six inches and two lines in the rear,25
about three hundred and sixty feet deep on the line of division from Lot Two (2) and26
about three hundred and five feet on a line of division from Lot Four (4).27
Act passed before James Fahey October 03, 1891 (transaction 2).28
Lot Four (4) measures about one hundred and fifteen feet front on said Bayou29
St. John, about one hundred and five feet six inches and two lines in the rear, about30
three hundred and five feet on a line of division from Lot Three (3), and about two31
hundred and forty-five feet on a line of division from Lot Five (5).32 HLS 11RS-507	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 459
Page 2 of 3
Lot Five (5) measures about one hundred and eight feet front on Bayou St.1
John, about one hundred and five feet six inches and three lines on the rear, about2
two hundred and forty-five feet on a line of division from Lot Four and about two3
hundred eleven feet on the line of division with Lot Six (6).4
Lot Six (6) measures about one hundred and six feet front on said Bayou St.5
John, about one hundred and five feet six inches and two lines wide in the rear, about6
two hundred and eleven feet deep on the line of division from Lot Five (5) and about7
two hundred and four feet on the other side line.8
Being the same property identified as 1700 Moss St. Tax Bill # 37W309429 and that9
according to the Orleans Parish Parcel map is bounded on the upstream side by 344310
Esplanade Ave, Tax Bill # 37W309401, bounded on the downstream side by 175611
Moss St., Tax Bill # 37W309415, and bounded on the rear by 3423 Esplanade Ave,12
Tax Bill# 37W309428.13
Section 2. The commissioner of the division of administration on behalf of the state14
of Louisiana, notwithstanding any other provision of the law to the contrary, is hereby15
authorized and empowered to purchase or receive any and all interest, excluding mineral16
rights, the following described property from the Deutsches Haus:17
A CERTAIN LOT OF GROUND, together with all the buildings and18
improvements thereon, and all the rights, ways, privileges, servitudes, appurtenances19
and advantages thereunto belonging or in anywise appertaining, situated in the City20
of New Orleans, First District of this City, in Square 521, bounded by Galvez,21
Johnson and Palmyra Streets and Cleveland Avenue (formerly Jackson Street). Said22
lot of ground measuring 78 feet, 1 inches and 4 lines front on Cleveland Street, 13523
feet 3 inches in depth and front on Galvez Street and 134 feet 10 inches and 3 lines24
in depth on the side line nearest to Johnson Street and 78 feet in width in the rear.25
According to a survey made by Gilbert & Kelly, Surveyors, dated August 4, 1953,26
which is annexed to an act before Hermann J. Schulze, N.P. dated August 14, 1953,27
said lot forms the corner of S. Galvez Street and Cleveland Avenue, measures the28
same as above with the exception of: 134 feet 10 inches 3 lines actual measurement,29
135 feet 0 inches and 3 lines title measurements in depth and front on S. Galvez30
Street and 78 feet 1 inch and 4 lines actual, 78 feet title measurements in width in the31
rear.32
The improvements thereon bear the Municipal Numbers 200 South Galvez Street33
(aka 2122 Cleveland Avenue), New Orleans, Louisiana 70112.34
AND35
ONE CERTAIN LOT OF GROUND, together with all the buildings and36
improvements thereon, and all the rights, ways, privileges, servitudes and advantages37
thereunto belonging or in any wise appertaining situated in the FIRST DISTRICT38
of the City of New Orleans, in SQUARE 521, bounded by South Galvez, Palmyra39
and South Johnson Streets, and Cleveland Avenue, designated by NUMBER40
FOURTEEN (14) OR TWENTY-FOUR (24) on a survey made by E.L. Eustis &41
Sons, Civil Engineers & Surveyors, dated 29 October 1954, a copy of which is42
annexed to vendor’s Act of purchase, and, according to which, said lot commences43
at a distance of one hundred and fifty feet from the corner of South Galvez and44
Palmyra Streets and measures thence thirty four feet, ten inches and three lines45
(34’10”3”’) front on South Galvez Street, by a depth between equal and parallel lines46
of one hundred and thirty feet, two inches and three lines (130’2”3”’).47
 The improvements thereon bear the Municipal Numbers 218-220 South48
Galvez Street, New Orleans, Louisiana 70112.49 HLS 11RS-507	ORIGINAL
HB NO. 459
Page 3 of 3
Section 3. The commissioner of the division of administration, on behalf of the state1
of Louisiana, is hereby authorized to enter into such agreements, covenants, conditions, and2
stipulations and to execute such documents as are necessary to properly effectuate any3
conveyance, sale, transfer, or assignment and delivery of title to the real property described4
in Section 1 herein, excluding, however, mineral rights, all of which as may be more5
specifically described in any such agreements entered into and documents executed by and6
between the commissioner and the Deutsches Haus, in exchange of consideration7
proportionate to the appraised value of the real property above described.8
Section 4. The commissioner of the division of administration, on behalf of the state9
of Louisiana, is hereby authorized to enter into such agreements, covenants, conditions, and10
stipulations and to execute such documents as are necessary to properly effectuate any11
conveyance, receipt of title to the real property described in Section 2 herein, excluding,12
however, mineral rights, all of which as may be more specifically described in any such13
agreements entered into and documents executed by and between the commissioner and the14
Deutsches Haus.15
Section 5. This Act shall become effective upon signature by the governor or, if not16
signed by the governor, upon expiration of the time for bills to become law without signature17
by the governor, as provided in Article III, Section 18 of the Constitution of Louisiana.  If18
vetoed, by the governor and subsequently approved by the legislature, this Act shall become19
effective on the day following such approval.20
DIGEST
The digest printed below was prepared by House Legislative Services. It constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument. The keyword, one-liner, abstract, and digest do not constitute
part of the law or proof or indicia of legislative intent.  [R.S. 1:13(B) and 24:177(E)]
Abramson	HB No. 459
Authorizes the exchange of properties between the division of administration and the
Deutsches Haus.  Provides for the reservation of mineral rights.
Effective upon signature of governor or lapse of time for gubernatorial action.