SLS 11RS-378 ENGROSSED Page 1 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Regular Session, 2011 SENATE BILL NO. 210 BY SENATOR MORRELL TAX/TAXATION. Temporarily exempts from tobacco tax cigars and smoking tobacco sampled during the Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers. (8/15/11) AN ACT1 To amend and reenact R.S. 47:854, relative to the intent and purposes of the tax on tobacco;2 to exempt certain tobacco products sampled at convention facilities during certain3 conventions from the purposes of such tax; to provide for the taxable periods in4 which the exemption applies; and to provide for related matters.5 Be it enacted by the Legislature of Louisiana:6 Section 1. R.S. 47:854 is hereby amended and reenacted to read as follows: 7 ยง854. Declaration of intent and purpose of Chapter 8 A. It is the intent and purpose of this Chapter to levy an excise tax on all9 cigars, cigarettes and smoking tobacco, as defined in this Chapter, sold, used,10 consumed, handled or distributed in this state, except as provided in R.S. 47:855 and11 to collect same from the dealer who first sells, uses, consumes, handles or distributes12 the same in the State state of Louisiana.13 B. It is further the intent and purpose of this Chapter that where a dealer14 gives away cigars, cigarettes or smoking tobacco for advertising or any other purpose15 whatsoever the same shall be taxed in the same manner as if they were sold, used,16 consumed, handled or distributed in this state; however, for the taxable periods17 SB NO. 210 SLS 11RS-378 ENGROSSED Page 2 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. beginning on and after January 1, 2013 through December 31, 2016 this shall1 not be construed to include cigars or pipe tobacco, as defined and appropriately2 labeled in accordance with the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act, the3 Tobacco Control Act, and all applicable state laws, federal laws, and4 regulations, sampled on the premises of convention facilities during the5 Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers.6 C. At no time shall there be any distribution of free samples of7 cigarettes, as defined in the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetics Act, and the8 Tobacco Control Act, consistent with 21 CFR 1140.16, and all applicable federal9 laws and regulations. Furthermore, distribution of free samples of smokeless10 tobacco, as defined in the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act, the Tobacco11 Control Act, shall only be permitted pursuant to all applicable federal laws and12 regulations.13 The original instrument was prepared by Cathy Wells. The following digest, which does not constitute a part of the legislative instrument, was prepared by Danielle Doiron. DIGEST Morrell (SB 210) Present law provides for the levy of a tax upon the sales, use, consumption, handling, or distribution of all cigars, cigarettes, and smoking and smokeless tobacco. Further provides that the tax be collected from the dealer who first sells, uses, consumes, handles, or distributes the tobacco in this state. Present law provides that where a dealer gives away cigars, cigarettes, or smoking tobacco for advertising or any other purpose whatsoever, the tobacco shall be taxed in the same manner as if they were sold, used, consumed, handled, or distributed in this state. Proposed law retains present law but exempts, from the state tax on tobacco, cigars, and pipe tobacco sampled on the premises of convention facilities during the Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers. Proposed law prohibits the distribution of free samples of cigarettes. Further provides for the distribution of free samples of smokeless tobacco pursuant to all applicable state and federal laws, and regulations. Effective for taxable periods beginning on and after Jan. 1, 2013 through taxable periods ending on Dec. 31, 2016. Effective August 15, 2011. (Amends R.S. 47:854) SB NO. 210 SLS 11RS-378 ENGROSSED Page 3 of 3 Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law; words in boldface type and underscored are additions. Summary of Amendments Adopted by Senate Committee Amendments Proposed by Senate Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs to the original bill. 1. Exempts cigars and pipe tobacco from the state tax on tobacco sampled at convention facilities during the Convention of the International Premium Cigar and Pipe Retailers. 2. Extends the effective date for taxable periods to December 31, 2016. 3. Prohibits the distribution of free samples of cigarettes, as defined in the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetics Act, and the Tobacco Act, pursuant to all applicable federal laws and regulations. 4. Provides for the distribution of free samples of smokeless tobacco, as defined in the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act, the Tobacco Control Act, and pursuant to all applicable federal laws and regulations.